EP1983387 - Holographic printing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/43] | Holographic printing apparatus and method | ||
[2017/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Usami, Yoshihisa c/o Fujifilm Corporation 577 Ushijima, Kasei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | [2017/44] |
Former [2008/43] | 01 /
Usami, Yoshihisa c/o Fujifilm Corporation 577 Ushijima, Kasei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/44] |
Former [2008/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08003691.6 | 28.02.2008 | [2008/43] | Priority number, date | JP20070054386 | 05.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007054386 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1983387 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1983387 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1983387 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/02, G03H1/30 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
G03H1/0236 (EP,US);
G03H1/0476 (EP,US);
G03H1/30 (EP,US);
G03H1/0248 (EP,US);
G03H1/182 (EP,US);
G03H1/265 (EP,US);
G03H1/28 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0016 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0413 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0417 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0478 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0482 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0497 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2223 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2231 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2263 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2271 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2284 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2289 (EP,US);
G03H2001/266 (EP,US);
G03H2001/303 (EP,US);
G03H2222/13 (EP,US);
G03H2222/33 (EP,US);
G03H2222/34 (EP,US);
G03H2227/03 (EP,US);
G03H2250/40 (EP,US);
G03H2260/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/44] |
Former [2009/28] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Holographische Druckvorrichtung | [2017/29] | English: | Holographic printing apparatus | [2017/29] | French: | Appareil d'impression holographique | [2017/29] |
Former [2008/43] | Holographische Druckvorrichtung und -verfahren | ||
Former [2008/43] | Holographic printing apparatus and method | ||
Former [2008/43] | Appareil et procédé d'impression holographique | Examination procedure | 04.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 06.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.06.2009 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 30.09.2009 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 16.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5291317 (NEWSWANGER CRAIG [US]) [Y] 11,12* column 2, line 49 - column 6, line 35; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]JPH1097175 (SONY CORP) [Y] 4 * abstract *; | [XY]WO2005078533 (ZEBRA IMAGING INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10,13 * the whole document * [Y] 4,11,12 | Examination | US6127066 | by applicant | JP2003063198 | JP2004042667 |