EP1985848 - Sensor module and sensor network for monitoring a wind energy array and corresponding monitoring method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bachmann GmbH Kreuzäckerweg 3 6800 Feldkirch / AT | [2011/25] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states µ-Sen GmbH Weimarische Strasse 10 07407 Rudolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oertel, Ulrich Loderstr. 3 07743 Jena / DE | 02 /
Biehl, Steffen, Dr. Engerda 21 07407 Uhlstädt-Kirchhasel / DE | 03 /
Iwert, Thomas Uferstr. 6 39307 Rossdorf / DE | 04 /
Fritsch, Holger Eichdorffstr. 15B 39114 Magdeburg / DE | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Beier, Ralph v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08004087.6 | 05.03.2008 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | DE20071011835 | 12.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007011835 | [2008/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1985848 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1985848 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/00, F03D7/04, F03D11/00 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
F03D7/047 (EP);
F03D17/00 (EP);
F05B2270/30 (EP);
F05B2270/404 (EP);
F05B2270/504 (EP);
F05B2270/803 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] |
Former [2010/33] | |||
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sensormodul und Sensornetzwerk zur Überwachung einer Windenergieanlage sowie entsprechende Überwachungsverfahren | [2008/44] | English: | Sensor module and sensor network for monitoring a wind energy array and corresponding monitoring method | [2008/44] | French: | Module de capteur et réseau de capteurs destinés à la surveillance d'une éolienne et procédé de surveillance correspondant | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 06.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 23.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 23.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 23.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 23.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5278773 (COUSINEAU KEVIN L [US]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03077048 (METSO AUTOMATION OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-30 * page 11, line 14 - page 13, line 25; figures 2,4 *; | [X]EP1519040 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1531376 (GAMESA EOLICA S A SOC UNIPERSO [ES]) [X] 1-30* the whole document *; | [X]US2005276696 (LEMIEUX DAVID L [US]) [X] 1-30 * paragraph [0048]; figures 8,9 * |