Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
28.10.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.04.2013 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.03.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.05.2011 | Change - applicant | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
01.04.2011 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
01.04.2011 | Change - representative | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
25.03.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.01.2011 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.10.2010 | First examination report | |
30.09.2010 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
03.09.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
03.09.2010 | Change - designated states | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
02.09.2010 | New entry: Receipt of request for further processing | |
02.09.2010 | New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing | |
16.07.2010 | Definitive list of designations | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
13.07.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.03.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.11.2009 | Publication of search report | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
26.09.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |