EP1974895 - Device for discharging mouldings from a rotary press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fette GmbH Grabauer Strasse 24 21493 Schwarzenbek / DE | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kolbe, Sven Möllner Strasse 35a 21514 Büchen / DE | 02 /
Arndt, Ulrich Sonnental 1 21481 Lauenburg / DE | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08004125.4 | 06.03.2008 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | DE20071015672 | 31.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007015672 | [2008/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1974895 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1974895 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | [2011/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1974895 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B30B11/08, B30B15/32, B65G11/20, B65G47/71 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
B30B15/32 (EP,US);
B30B11/08 (EP,US);
B65G11/203 (EP,US);
B65G47/71 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/40] | B30B11/08, B30B15/32, B65G47/72, B65G47/71, B65G47/76 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für den Ablauf von Presslingen aus einer Rundläuferpresse | [2008/40] | English: | Device for discharging mouldings from a rotary press | [2008/40] | French: | Dispositif de déchargement de pièces moulées provenant d'une presse rotative | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 16.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2008 | CY | 01.02.2012 | CZ | 01.02.2012 | DK | 01.02.2012 | EE | 01.02.2012 | FI | 01.02.2012 | HR | 01.02.2012 | IE | 01.02.2012 | LT | 01.02.2012 | LV | 01.02.2012 | MT | 01.02.2012 | NL | 01.02.2012 | PL | 01.02.2012 | RO | 01.02.2012 | SE | 01.02.2012 | SI | 01.02.2012 | SK | 01.02.2012 | TR | 01.02.2012 | LU | 06.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | BG | 01.05.2012 | NO | 01.05.2012 | GR | 02.05.2012 | ES | 12.05.2012 | IS | 01.06.2012 | PT | 01.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LU | 06.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 01.02.2012 | |
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 01.02.2012 | |
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 01.02.2012 | |
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU887263 ; | [A]GB250957 (DUBILIER CONDENSER CO 1925 LTD) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 75-98; figure 1 *; | [A]GB576898 (F W HAMPSHIRE & COMPANY LTD, et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 115 - page 3, line 21; figure 3 *; | [A]US2642974 (OGLE JOHN S) [A] 1 * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 11; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]JPS58107294U (NN) [A] 1* figure 3 *; | [A]US4870335 (KOSHIDA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 34-55; figure 4 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 40, Database accession no. 1982-85416E, XP002629928 & SU887263 A1 19811207 (ZHDANOVSKIJ SP PK B MED PROMY [SU]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - LAYBOURN ET AL, "Small Card Stacker", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (19690201), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013078932 [A] 1 * the whole document * |