blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2098687

EP2098687 - Rotor for a turbo engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2010
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.09.2010  [2010/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/37]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kupetz, Markus
Am Heytgraben 84
47608 Geldern / DE
02 / Stüer, Heinrich, Dr.
Antruper Strasse 24
45721 Haltern / DE
 [2009/37]
Application number, filing date08004272.407.03.2008
[2009/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2098687
Date:09.09.2009
Language:DE
[2009/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2008
ClassificationIPC:F01D5/22, F01D5/30, F01D11/00
[2009/37]
CPC:
F01D5/22 (EP); F01D11/008 (EP); F05D2220/72 (EP);
F05D2240/80 (EP); F05D2250/12 (EP); F05D2250/13 (EP);
F05D2250/182 (EP); F05D2260/96 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting states[2010/19]
Former [2009/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Rotor für eine Strömungsmaschine[2009/37]
English:Rotor for a turbo engine[2009/37]
French:Rotor pour une turbomachine[2009/37]
Examination procedure10.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/38]
16.04.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/38]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201003   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1124038  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020]; figure 1 *;
 [X]DE19940556  (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 45; figures 1-3,6; claim 3 *;
 [X]FR2235272  (ROLLS ROYCE [GB]) [X] 1,5,6 * page 3, lines 15-39; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US6371727  (STANGELAND MAYNARD L [US] ET AL) [X] 1,6,7 * column 3, lines 4-44; figures 2-6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.