EP1968164 - A bulb socket and an assembling method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | For all designated states Ichikoh Industries, Ltd. 10-18, Higashi-Gotanda 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8627 / JP | [2011/17] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City Mie, 510-8503 / JP | ||
For all designated states Ichikoh Industries, Ltd. 10-18, Higashi-Gotanda 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8627 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asao, Kazuhiro c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | 02 /
Machida, Yoshikazu c/o Isehara Plant, Ichikoh Industries, Ltd., 80, Itado Isehara-shi, Kanagawa, 259-1192 / JP | [2010/45] |
Former [2008/37] | 01 /
Asao, Kazuhiro Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | ||
02 /
Machida, Yoshikazu Isehara Plant Ichikoh Industries, Ltd. 80, Itado Isehara-shi Kanagawa, 259-1192 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08004303.7 | 07.03.2008 | [2008/37] | Priority number, date | JP20070058843 | 08.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007058843 | [2008/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1968164 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1968164 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | [2009/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1968164 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01R33/09 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
H01R33/09 (EP,US);
H01R13/506 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2010/25] |
Former [2008/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lampenfassung und Montageverfahren dafür | [2008/37] | English: | A bulb socket and an assembling method therefor | [2008/37] | French: | Douille d'ampoule et son procédé d'assemblage | [2008/37] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 15.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH10284204 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD) [DA] 1,9 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5630729 (FRANCIS MICHAEL E [US]) [A] 1,9 * figure 5 *; | [A]US6075318 (NOLL THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1,9 * figures 4a-4d *; | [DA]JP2003031328 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) [DA] 1,9 * figure 1 * | by applicant | JP2003031328 | JPH10284204 |