EP2008678 - Aerosol medication inhalation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRE Holding, Inc. 2941 Oak Lake Blvd. Midlothian, VA 23112 / US | [2009/36] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states PARI Innovative Manufactures Inc. 13800 Hull Street Road Midlothian Virginia 23112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gallem, Thomas Daiserstrasse 15 81371 München / DE | 02 /
Gowanlock, Kevin Grant 610 Newbold Street, Unit 7 London, Ontario, N6E 2T6 / CA | 03 /
Lynch, Robert Carlton 1979 N Tuchi Circle Fuquay Varina, NC 27526 / US | [2009/05] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
Gallem, Thomas Daiserstrasse 15 81371 München / DE | ||
02 /
Gowanlock, Kevin Grant 1054 Dalhousie Drive London, Ontario, N6K 1M7 / CA | |||
03 /
Lynch, Robert Carlton 2419 Walden Creek Drive Apex, North Carolina / US | Representative(s) | Kröncke, Rolf, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13 a 30173 Hannover / DE | [2016/12] |
Former [2009/36] | Kröncke, Rolf, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät GbR Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2009/01] | Jepsen, Ralph GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER GbR Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 08004544.6 | 02.05.2003 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | US20020137007 | 02.05.2002 Original published format: US 137007 | [2009/01] | Previously filed application, date | EP20030009988 | 02.05.2003 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2008678 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2008678 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2008678 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
A61M15/009 (EP,US);
A61M15/0016 (EP,US);
A61M15/0018 (EP,US);
A61M15/0021 (EP,US);
A61M15/0086 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0233 (EP,US);
A61M2206/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur Inhalation eines Aerosol-Medikaments | [2009/01] | English: | Aerosol medication inhalation system | [2009/01] | French: | Système d'inhalation de médication d'aérosol | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 22.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03009988.1 / EP1358901 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030009988) is 03.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2003 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | IE | 02.05.2016 | LU | 02.05.2016 | FR | 31.05.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | GB | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.05.2003 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.05.2016 | ||
LU | 02.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | BE | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.05.2016 | ||
LU | 02.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | BE | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | BE | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | BE | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
GR | 24.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6026808 (ARMER THOMAS ALEX [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11 * column 6, line 7 - line 27; figures 1-3 * * column 7, line 26 - column 9, line 25 * [Y] 8-10; | [Y]US5848588 (FOLEY MARTIN P [CA], et al) [Y] 8-10 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 28; figures 1-3,5 *; | [A]US6367471 (GENOSAR AMIR [IL], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 9 - line 20; figures 1-4 * * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 19 *; | [A]US6039042 (SLADEK DAVID T [US]) [A] 1,8-10 * column 3, line 21 - column 6, line 17; figure - * | by applicant | US6026808 |