EP1970595 - Damping force generating mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYB Corporation World Trade Center Building 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | [2016/03] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states KAYABA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nobumichi, Hanawa c/o Kayaba Industry Co., Ltd. World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | [2016/19] |
Former [2008/38] | 01 /
Nobumichi, Hanawa c/o Kayaba Industry Co., Ltd. World Trade Center Blgd. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/19] |
Former [2008/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08004606.3 | 12.03.2008 | [2008/38] | Priority number, date | JP20070064792 | 14.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007064792 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1970595 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1970595 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1970595 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/46 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
F16F9/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2014/50] |
Former [2008/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mechanismus zum Erzeugen von Dämpfungskraft | [2008/38] | English: | Damping force generating mechanism | [2008/38] | French: | Mécanisme à génération de force d'amortissement | [2008/38] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 03.10.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2006183864 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD) [AD] 1-3,10; | EP1662171 [ ] (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0101]; figure - *; | [A]JPS5830544 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-3,10 * abstract *; | [A]JPH1073141 (TOKICO LTD) [A] 1-3,10 * abstract *; | [A]US2006175166 (FISCHER JURGEN [DE]) [A] 1-3,10 * figure - * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0067] *; | [A]EP1637764 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,10 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]JPS58221033 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD) [A] 1-3,10 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2006183864 | JP2007064792 |