EP1975073 - Machine for filling and closing sacks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windmöller & Hölscher KG Münsterstrasse 50 49525 Lengerich/Westf. / DE | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kölker, Martin Friedenstrasse 9 49477 Ibbenbüren / DE | 02 /
Huil, Oliver Tannenstrasse 7 48477 Hörstel / DE | 03 /
Knoke, Thomas Zum Bussberg 8 33619 Bielefeld / DE | 04 /
Schulten, Ludger Nachtigallenweg 7 48496 Hopsten / DE | [2008/40] | Application number, filing date | 08004887.9 | 15.03.2008 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | DE20071015251 | 27.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007015251 | [2008/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1975073 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1975073 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1975073 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65B43/46 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
B65B43/465 (EP);
B65B1/02 (EP);
B65B1/12 (EP);
B65B1/22 (EP);
B65B1/26 (EP);
B65B1/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Maschine zum Füllen und Schliessen von Säcken | [2008/40] | English: | Machine for filling and closing sacks | [2008/40] | French: | Machine destinée à remplir et fermer des sacs | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 01.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2008 | BG | 04.11.2015 | CY | 04.11.2015 | CZ | 04.11.2015 | DK | 04.11.2015 | EE | 04.11.2015 | FI | 04.11.2015 | HR | 04.11.2015 | LT | 04.11.2015 | LV | 04.11.2015 | MC | 04.11.2015 | MT | 04.11.2015 | RO | 04.11.2015 | SE | 04.11.2015 | SI | 04.11.2015 | SK | 04.11.2015 | TR | 04.11.2015 | NO | 04.02.2016 | GR | 05.02.2016 | IS | 04.03.2016 | PT | 04.03.2016 | GB | 15.03.2016 | IE | 15.03.2016 | LU | 15.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | FR | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | [2023/15] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 15.03.2008 | |
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
GB | 15.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 15.03.2008 | |
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
GB | 15.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.03.2008 | |
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
GB | 15.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
GB | 15.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
GB | 15.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
GB | 15.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 04.11.2015 | |
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 04.11.2015 | |
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 04.11.2015 | |
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 04.11.2015 | |
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 04.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4510736 (MUELLER MATHIAS [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9301355U (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5768863 (MCGREGOR HAROLD R [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1050457 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 4, line 30 - line 38 * * figure 5 *; | [AD]WO2006053627 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE], et al) [AD] 1-9* abstract * | by applicant | DE9301355U | EP1459981 | WO2006053627 |