EP1975077 - Pallet mounting frame and transport and storage system including a pallet mounting frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hintz Marketing GmbH Baumgarten 10 77834 Rheinmünster / DE | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hintz, Helmut Baumgarten 10 77834 Rheinmünster / DE | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Mierswa, Klaus Iridium IP Friedrich-König-Strasse 3-5 68167 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Mierswa, Klaus Friedrichstrasse 171 68199 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08005260.8 | 20.03.2008 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | DE20072004767U | 31.03.2007 Original published format: DE 202007004767 U | DE20072015678U | 10.11.2007 Original published format: DE 202007015678 U | [2008/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1975077 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/18, // B65D21/08 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
B65D19/18 (EP);
B65D21/083 (EP);
B65D2519/00034 (EP);
B65D2519/00069 (EP);
B65D2519/00174 (EP);
B65D2519/00208 (EP);
B65D2519/00268 (EP);
B65D2519/00288 (EP);
B65D2519/00318 (EP);
B65D2519/00333 (EP);
B65D2519/00422 (EP);
B65D2519/00497 (EP);
B65D2519/00502 (EP);
B65D2519/00601 (EP);
B65D2519/00641 (EP);
B65D2519/00661 (EP);
B65D2519/00711 (EP);
B65D2519/00791 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | Palettenaufsetzrahmen sowie Transport- und Lagerungssystem umfassend einen Palettenaufsetzrahmen | [2008/40] | English: | Pallet mounting frame and transport and storage system including a pallet mounting frame | [2008/40] | French: | Cadre de pose de palettes ainsi que système de transport et de stockage comprenant un cadre de pose de palettes | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3133511 (PHILLIPS DAVID B) [Y] 14 * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]DE2033693 (RIEUBLAND ROGER) [Y] 10,12,13,15 * page 1 - page 5; figures 1-10 *; | [XY]DE7621951U (GNOSJOEPLAST AB [SE]) [X] 1,5,7,8 * page 1 - page 3; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2-4,9-15; | [Y]EP0510353 (STREICH ROLAND SEN [DE]) [Y] 4,9-13,15 * page 11, line 37 - line 43 * * page 12, line 55 - line 56 * * figures 3,14,15 *; | [Y]US6266972 (BOSTIC WILLIAM M [US]) [Y] 10,15 * column 3, line 6 - line 16 * * column 4, line 22 - line 26 * * figures 1,2,4-6; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1524170 (LINPAC MOULDINGS LTD [GB]) [Y] 2,3 * column 3, line 13 - line 18 ** figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005230391 (HADAR NIR [IL]) [Y] 4,9,15 * paragraphs [0046] , [0055] * * figures 13A,13B,13C * | Examination | DE2936258 | by applicant | DE7621951U | EP0510353 |