EP1985714 - Method and kit for detecting a target molecule employing at least two affinity probes and rolling circle replication of padlock probes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/44] | Method for detecting a target molecule employing at least two affinity probes and rolling circle replication of padlock probes | ||
[2011/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olink AB Dag Hammarskjölds väg 54A 751 83 Uppsala / SE | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Landegren, Ulf Norra Parkvägen 29 75 645 Uppsala / SE | [2011/41] |
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08005289.7 | 25.03.1999 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | EP19980302278 | 25.03.1998 Original published format: EP 98302278 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1985714 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1985714 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/532 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6816 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6844 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2531/125, C12Q2525/307, C12Q2521/313 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2531/125, C12Q2525/307, C12Q2525/301 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2531/125, C12Q2521/301 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2531/125, C12Q2525/307, C12Q2521/313 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2008/44] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2008/44] | Title | German: | Zwei Affinitätsproben und Rolling-Circle-Replikation zur Detektion eines Zielmoleküls verwendende Verfahren und Kit | [2011/35] | English: | Method and kit for detecting a target molecule employing at least two affinity probes and rolling circle replication of padlock probes | [2011/35] | French: | Un procédé et une trousse pour détecter un cible utilisant la réplication de cercle de roulement et deux sondes d'affinité | [2011/35] |
Former [2008/44] | Ein Verfahren das zwei Affinitätsproben und Rolling-Circle-Replikation zur Detektion eines Zielmoleküls verwendet | ||
Former [2008/44] | Method for detecting a target molecule employing at least two affinity probes and rolling circle replication of padlock probes | ||
Former [2008/44] | Un procédé pour détecter un cible utilisant la réplication de cercle de roulement et deux sondes d'affinité | Examination procedure | 24.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 21.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99917891.6 / EP1066414 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990917891) is 15.09.2004 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.02.2012 | DK | 29.02.2012 | IT | 29.02.2012 | NL | 29.02.2012 | SE | 29.02.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | [2013/07] |
Former [2012/50] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 29.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9719193 (UNIV YALE [US]) [A] 1-7 * see whole doc., esp. claims and figures;; example 5 *; | [A] - JOERGER R D ET AL, "ANALYTE DETECTION WITH DNA-LABELED ANTIBODIES AND POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, (19950901), vol. 41, no. 9, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1371 - 1377, XP001018334 [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - TAKESHI SANO ET AL, "IMMUNO-PCR: VERY SENSITIVE ANTIGEN DETECTION BY MEANS OF SPECIFIC ANTIBODY-DNA CONJUGATES", SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, (19921002), vol. 258, no. 5079, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 120 - 122, XP000384402 [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [DPX] - BANER J. ET AL.,, "Signal amplification of padlock probes by rolling circle replication", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19981115), vol. 26, no. 22, pages 5073 - 5078, XP002112357 [DPX] 1-7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/26.22.5073 | [PA] - SCHWEITZER B ET AL, "Inaugural article: immunoassays with rolling circle DNA amplification: a versatile platform for ultrasensitive antigen detection", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, (20000829), vol. 97, no. 18, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 10113 - 10119, XP002207138 [PA] 1-7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.170237197 | Examination | - JARVIUS MALIN ET AL, "In situ detection of phosphorylated platelet-derived growth factor receptor beta using a generalized proximity ligation method", MOLECULAR & CELLULAR PROTEOMICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, INC, US, vol. 6, no. 9, doi:10.1074/MCP.M700166-MCP200, ISSN 1535-9476, (20070901), pages 1500 - 1509, (20070612), XP002635677 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/MCP.M700166-MCP200 | - SÖDERBERG O ET AL, "Direct observation of individual endogenous protein complexes in situ by proximity ligation", NATURE METHODS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, vol. 3, no. 12, doi:10.1038/NMETH947, ISSN 1548-7091, (20061201), pages 995 - 1000, (20061029), XP002522344 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NMETH947 |