Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8792820 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2014 | B2 | US2011111692 | 12.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP53246 | 19.03.2009 | EP08005308 | 20.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201006231 | 30.11.2011 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP53246 | 19.03.2009 | EP08005308 | 20.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009115573 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2009 | A3 | WO2009115573 | 24.09.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08005308 | 20.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2104179 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2016 | B1 | EP2104179 | 23.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08005308 | 20.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2572884T | 02.06.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP08005308 | 20.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1136391 | 25.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08005308 | 20.03.2008 |