EP1939647 - System and method for detection and tracking of targets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altratek, Inc. 111 Eight Avenue, 13th Floor New York, NY 10036 / US | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arikan, Orhan Bilkent University Housing No. 29/4 06533 Bilkent Ankara / TR | 02 /
Ozdemir, Ahmet Kemal Guzelevler Sisli Sokak No. 22/7 06170 Yenimahalle / TR | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08005591.6 | 06.06.2001 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | US20000209758P | 06.06.2000 Original published format: US 209758 P | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1939647 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1939647 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/00 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
G01S7/295 (EP);
G01S13/524 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Erkennung und Verfolgung von Zielen | [2008/27] | English: | System and method for detection and tracking of targets | [2008/27] | French: | Système et procédé pour détecter et suivre des cibles | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 10.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01942045.4 / EP1287379 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5416488 (GROVER RICHARD K [AZ], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 2, lines 10-46 * * column 3, line 9 - column 5, line 2 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X] - OZDEMIR A K ET AL, "Efficient computation of the ambiguity function and the Wigner distribution on arbitrary line segments", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 1999. ISCAS '99. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1999 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ORLANDO, FL, USA 30 MAY-2 JUNE 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990530), vol. 4, ISBN 0-7803-5471-0, pages 171 - 174, XP010341157 [X] 1-4,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1999.779969 | [A] - OZAKTAS H M ET AL, "DIGITAL COMPUTATION OF THE FRACTIONAL FOURIER TRANSFORM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199609), vol. 44, no. 9, ISSN 1053-587X, pages 2141 - 2150, XP000637522 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.536672 | [A] - LUSH D C, "Airborne radar analysis using the ambiguity function", IEEE, (19900507), pages 600 - 605, XP010007427 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6636174 | US5760732 | US5657022 | US5583505 | US5548157 | US5457462 | - V. NAMIAS, "The fractional order Fourier transform and its application to quantum Mechanics", J. INST. MATH. APPL., (1980), vol. 25, pages 241 - 265 | - W. LOHMANN; B. H. SOFFER, "Relationships between the Radon-Wigner and fractional Fourier transforms", J. OPT. SOC. AM. A, (1994), vol. 11, pages 1798 - 1801 | - A. K. OZDEMIR; O. ARIKAN, "Fast computation of the ambiguity function and the Wigner distribution on arbitrary line segments", IEEE TRANS. SIGNAL PROCESS., (200102), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 381 - 393 | - A. K. OZDEMIR; O. ARIKAN, "Efficient computation of the ambiguity function and the Wigner distribution on arbitrary line segments", PROC. IEEE INT. SYMP. CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, (199905), vol. IV, pages 171 - 174 | - I. RAVEH; D. MENDLOVIC, "New properties of the Radon transform of the cross-Wigner/ambiguity distribution function", IEEE TRANS. SIGNAL PROCESS., (199907), vol. 47, no. 7, pages 2077 - 2080 | - D. MENDLOVIC; H. M. OZAKTAS, "Fractional Fourier transforms and their optical implementation: I", J. OPT. SOC. AM. A, (1993), vol. 10, no. 9, pages 1875 - 1881 | - H. M. OZAKTAS; D. MENDLOVIC, "Fractional Fourier transforms and their optical implementation: II", J OPT. SOC. AM. A, (1993), vol. 10, no. 12, pages 2522 - 2531 | - H. M. OZAKTAS ET AL., "Digital computation of the fractional Fourier transform", IEEE TRANS. SIGNAL PROCESS., (199609), vol. 44, no. 9, pages 2141 - 2150 | - L. B. ALMEIDA, "The fractional Fourier transform and time-frequency Representations", IEEE TRANS. SIGNAL PROCESS., (199411), vol. 42, no. 11, pages 3084 - 3091 | - L. COHEN, "Time-frequency distributions - A review", PROC. IEEE, (198907), vol. 77, no. 7, pages 941 - 981 | - R. N. BRACEWELL, The Fourier Transform and its Applications, MCGRAW-HILL BOOK COMPANY, (1978), pages 356 - 381 | - G. H. GOLUB; C. F. VAN LOAN, Matrix Computations, JOHN HOPKINS UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1996), pages 206 - 259 | - V. G. NEBABIN, Methods and Techniques of Radar Recognition, ARTECH HOUSE, INC., (1995), pages 106 - 125 | - R. E. BLAHUT; W. MILLER; JR. C. H. WILCOX, Radar and Sonar - Part I, SPRINGER--VERLAG, (1991), vol. 32, pages 1 - 29 | - R. E. KALMAN, "A new approach to linear filtering and prediction problems", J BASIC ENGINEERING, TRANS. ASME SERIES D, (1960), vol. 82, pages 35 - 45 | - PER-OLOF GUTMAN; MORDEKHAI VELGER, "Tracking Targets Using Adaptive Kalman Filtering", IEEE TRANS. AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS, (199009), vol. 26, no. 5, pages 691 - 699 | - L. R. RABINER; R. W. SCHAFER; C. M. RADER, "The Chirp z-Transform Algorithm", IEEE TRANS. AUDIO AND ELECTROACOUSTICS, (196906), vol. AU-17, no. 2, pages 86 - 92 |