EP2056579 - Gateway providing automatic call-transfer for VoIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contrel Technology Co., Ltd. 3F, No. 6 Nanke 5th Rd., Tainan Science Park Sinshin Township, Tainan County 744 / TW | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Jen-Chi 19F.-3,No.68 Dasyue Road Hsinchu City / TW | 02 /
Lee, Bing-Huan No.62, Lane 312 Binhu Road Niaosong Township Kaohsiung County / TW | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08005699.7 | 26.03.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | TW20070141048 | 31.10.2007 Original published format: TW 96141048 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2056579 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/54 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
H04M3/54 (EP,US);
H04M7/0069 (EP,US);
H04M2207/20 (EP,US);
H04M3/42314 (EP,US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | Gateway mit automatischer Rufweiterleitung für VoIP | [2009/19] | English: | Gateway providing automatic call-transfer for VoIP | [2009/19] | French: | Passerelle supportant un transfert automatique d'appels pour VoIP | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 07.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003059018 (EBER MELLO [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] *; | [X]WO2006118750 (SBC KNOWLEDGE VENTURES LP [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 1 - page 5; figures 1-3 *; | [A] - SCHULZRINNE H ET AL, "Signaling for Internet telephony", NETWORK PROTOCOLS, 1998. PROCEEDINGS. SIXTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE O N AUSTIN, TX, USA 13-16 OCT. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19981013), ISBN 978-0-8186-8988-8, pages 298 - 307, XP010309377 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [3.2.] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICNP.1998.723751 |