EP1975160 - Polymerizable compound, polymer, ink composition, printed articles and inkjet recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimohara, Norihide c/o Fujifilm Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
Nagase, Hisato c/o Fujifilm Corporation 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Tsujihata, Shigetomo c/o Fujifilm Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa / JP | [2013/03] |
Former [2008/40] | 01 /
Shimohara, Norihide c/o Fujifilm Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | ||
02 /
Nagase, Hisato c/o Fujifilm Corporation 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Tsujihata, Shigetomo c/o Fujifilm Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08005793.8 | 27.03.2008 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | JP20070095456 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007095456 | JP20070294571 | 13.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007294571 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1975160 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1975160 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D221/06, C07D471/06, C07D471/16, C09B5/62 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
C07D221/06 (EP,US);
C07D471/06 (EP,US);
C07D471/16 (EP,US);
C09D11/101 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/24] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Polymerisierbare Verbindung, Polymer, Tintenzusammensetzung, gedruckte Artikel und Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsverfahren | [2008/40] | English: | Polymerizable compound, polymer, ink composition, printed articles and inkjet recording method | [2008/40] | French: | Composé polymérisable, polymère, composition d'encre, articles imprimés et procédé d'enregistrement à jet d'encre | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 02.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9102032 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 7, line 5 - page 7, line 18; claim 1 *; | [X]JP2001167885 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [X] 1-4 * page 18 - page 20; compound E *; | [X]US2004016370 (OLSON DAVID B [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0063]; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2004029028 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 32, line 11 - page 32, line 27; examples 22,23; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2005102250 (OREAL [FR], et al) [X] 1* page 38 *; | [PX] - WÖLL D ET AL, "Radical Polymerization Tracked by Single Molecule Spectroscopy", ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (20080111), vol. 47, pages 783 - 787, XP002487959 [PX] 1-4 * compound 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200704196 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. BRN: 10195975, XP002487960 [X] 1 * column A * | [ ] - AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 57, no. 9, pages 885 - 894 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. BRN: 9232054, XP002487961 [X] 1 * column A * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 1262 - 1267 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. BRN: 1490580, XP002487962 [X] 1 * column A * | [ ] - YUKI GOSEI KAGAKU KYOKAISHI, (1972), vol. 30, page 897 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. BRN: 8965407, XP002487963 [X] 1 * column A * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL PHYSICS, (2001), vol. 114, no. 5, pages 6739 - 6743 | by applicant | JPS489005B | US2833827 | JPS4420189B | JPS4537377B | US3567453 | JPS4642363B | JPS473981B | JPS476416B | JPS4722326B | JPS4723664B | JPS4842965B | GB1388492 | US3902144 | US3901710 | JPS5182102 | JPS5214278B | JPS5214279B | JPS5214727B | JPS52134692 | JPS53702 | DE2641100 | JPS53133022 | JPS53133428 | US4181531 | JPS5534414B | JPS55500806 | JPS5675643 | DE3021590 | DE3021599 | EP0044115 | EP0046083 | JPS5730704 | US4318791 | US4343891 | US4371605 | EP0084515 | US4431774 | EP0101122 | EP0104143 | EP0109772 | EP0109773 | JPS59138205 | JPS59152396 | JPS59174831 | JPS5942864B | JPS608047B | DE3333450 | DE3337024 | JPS6084305 | JPS6026483B | JPS6026403B | JPS60132767 | EP0156153 | JPS60198538 | JPS61151197 | JPS61194062 | US4618564 | EP0199672 | JPS6218537 | JPS626223B | JPS6258241 | JPS6281345 | EP0233567 | JPS6341484 | US4734444 | JPS6314340B | US4743528 | JPS63138345 | JPS63142345 | JPS63142346 | JPS63143537 | EP0271851 | US4760013 | JPS6340799B | EP0279210 | EP0284561 | EP0290750 | JPS6361950B | EP0297443 | EP0297442 | JPS6418143 | JPS6433104 | US4837124 | JPH01152109 | JPH0134242B | JPH01304453 | JPH02249 | JPH024705 | JPH029597B | JPH029596B | JPH0296514 | EP0370693 | JPH02150848 | US4933377 | JPH02211452 | EP0388343 | JPH02245756 | EP0422570 | JPH03101686 | JPH04365048 | JPH05142772 | JPH05281728 | JPH05345790 | JPH069714 | JPH06191605 | JPH06250387 | JPH06298818 | JPH06308727 | WO9954415 | JP2001031892 | JP2001040068 | JP2001055507 | JP2001220526 | JP2001310938 | JP2001310937 | JP2002012607 | JP2002188025 | JP2003026978 | JP2003119414 | JP2003321628 | JP2003341217 | JP2003342503 | JP2004018656 | JP2004131589 | - BRUCE M. MONROE ET AL., CHEMICAL REVUE, (1993), vol. 93, page 435 | - R. S. DAVIDSON, JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY A: CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 73, page 81 | - J. P. FAUSSIER, "Photoinitiated Polymerization-Theory and Applications", REPORT, RAPRA TECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 9 | - M. TSUNOOKA ET AL., PROG. POLYM. SCI., (1996), vol. 21, page 1 | - "Japanese Research Association for Organic Electronics Materials Ed.", Organic Materials for Imaging, BUN-SHIN SHUPPAN, (1993), pages 187 - 192 | - F. D. SAEVA, TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 156, page 59 | - G. G. MASLAK, TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 168, page 1 | - H. B. SHUSTER ET AL., JACS, (1990), vol. 112, page 6329 | - I. D. F. EATON ET AL., JACS, (1980), vol. 102, page 3298 | - J. P. FOUASSIER; J. F. RABEK, RADIATION CURING IN POLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1993), pages 77 - 117 | - WAKABAYASHI ET AL., BULL. CHEM. SOC. JAPAN, (1969), vol. 42, page 2924 | - F. C. SCHAEFER ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1964), vol. 29, page 1527 | - M. R. SANDER ET AL., JOURNAL OF POLYMER SOCIETY, (1972), vol. 10, page 3173 |