EP1950288 - Endoglucanase from Thermotoga [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verenium Corporation 4955 Directors Place San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bylina, Edward J. 444 Winthrop Place Henderson, NV 89074 / US | 02 /
Swanson, Ronald V. 13304 Barbados Way Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 03 /
Lam, David E. 1671 Windemere Drive San Marcos, CA 92078 / US | 04 /
Mathur, Eric J. 2654 Galicia Way Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08005821.7 | 10.01.1997 | [2008/31] | Priority number, date | US19960583787 | 11.01.1996 Original published format: US 583787 | US19960056916P | 13.09.1996 Original published format: US 56916 P | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1950288 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/26, C12N1/20, C07H21/04 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
C12Y302/01022 (EP);
C12N9/2402 (EP);
C12N9/2445 (EP);
C12N9/2451 (EP);
C12N9/2454 (EP);
C12N9/2457 (EP);
C12N9/2468 (EP);
C12N9/2471 (EP);
C12N9/2491 (EP);
C12N9/2494 (EP);
C12Y302/01023 (EP);
C12Y302/01025 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/31] | Title | German: | Thermotoga-Endoglucanase | [2008/31] | English: | Endoglucanase from Thermotoga | [2008/31] | French: | Endoglucanase de Thermotoga | [2008/31] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 31.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/31] | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04016461.8 / EP1469066 | EP97906876.4 / EP0912725 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0606008 (TAKARA SHUZO CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-11,13-15,17,18,20-22,25-27,29-31 * abstract * * page 2, line 4 - line 10 * * page 9, line 33 - line 36 * * seq id nos 1-2 *; | [X]EP0687732 (TAKARA SHUZO CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-11,13-15,17,18,20-22,25-27,29-31 * abstract * * page 2, line 10 - line 15 *; | [E]WO9720918 (RECOMBINANT BIOCATALYSIS INC [US]) [E] 1-3,5-9* the whole document *; | [E]WO9725417 (RECOMBINANT BIOCATALYSIS INC [US]) [E] 1-59 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9744361 (RECOMBINANT BIOCATALYSIS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-15,17-59 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9824799 (DIVERSA CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-59 * the whole document *; | [X] - DAKHOVA O N ET AL, "CLONING AND EXPRESSION IN ESCHERICHIA COLI OF THERMOTOGA NEAPOLITANA GENES CODING FOR ENZYMES OF CARBOHYDRATE SUBSTRATE DEGRADATION", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS,US,ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, (19930816), vol. 194, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 1359 - 1364, XP002026991 [X] 1-3,5-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1993.1974 | [T] - DAKHOVA ET AL., "Thermotoga neapolitana bgA1 gene", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19970701), XP002154622 [T] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document * | [X] - DAKHOVA ET AL., "T. neapolitana lamA gene and bg1B gene", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19951231), XP002154623 [X] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document * | [A] - VOORHORST W G B ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF THE CELB GENE CODING FOR BETA-GLUCOSIDASE FROM THE HYPERTHERMOPHILIC ARCHAEON PYROCOCCUS FURIOSUS AND ITS EXPRESSION AND SITE-DIRECTED MUTATION IN ESCHERICHIA COLI", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY,US,WASHINGTON, DC, (19951201), vol. 177, no. 24, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 7105 - 7111, XP002064570 [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - GRAEBNITZ F ET AL, "STRUCTURE OF THE BETA-GLUCOSIDASE GENE BGLA OF CLOSTRIDIUM THERMOCELLUM. SEQUENCE ANALYSIS REVEALS A SUPERFAMILY OF CELLULASES AND BETA-GLYCOSIDASES INCLUDING HUMAN LACTASE/PHLORIZIN HYDROLASE", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY,DE,BERLIN, (19910901), vol. 200, no. 2, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 301 - 309, XP000874574 [A] 1-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1991.tb16186.x | [A] - CANGANELLA F ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF AMYLOLYTIC AND PULLULYTIC ENZYMES FROM THERMOPHILIC ARCHAEA AND FROM A NEW FERVIDOBACTERIUM SPECIES", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY,DE,SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, (1994), vol. 42, no. 2/03, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 239 - 245, XP000602919 [A] 9,17,19 * abstract * * page 244, column L * | [A] - BRONNEMEIER K ET AL, "PURIFICATION OF THERMOTOGA MARITIMA ENZYMES FOR THE DEGRADATION OF CELLULOSIC MATERIALS", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON,DC, US, (199504), vol. 61, no. 4, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 1399 - 1407, XP001005565 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - CARANSA A ET AL, "A NOVEL ENZYME APPLICATION FOR CORN WET MILLING", STARCH STARKE, WILEY-VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (1988), vol. 40, no. 11, ISSN 0038-9056, pages 409 - 411, XP002030182 [A] 19,36 * abstract * * page 409, column R * | [PX] - BAUER ET AL., "Comparison of a beta-glucosidase and a beta-mannosidase from hyperthermophilic archaeon Pyrococcus furiosus", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19960927), vol. 271, no. 39, pages 23749 - 23755, XP002154624 [PX] 1-3,5-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.39.23749 | [PX] - BAUER ET AL., "Pyrococcus furiosus beta mannosidase (bmnA) gene, complete ccds", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19960702), XP002154625 [PX] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document * | [PX] - BAUER ET AL., "Beta-mannosidase", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19961101), XP002154626 [PX] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4946778 | - DAY, A.G.; WITHERS, S.G., "Purification and characterization of a ß-glucosidase from Alcaligenes faecalis", CAN. J. BIOCHEM. CELL. BIOL., (1986), vol. 64, pages 914 - 922 | - KENGEN, S.W.M. ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 213, pages 305 - 312 | - AIT, N.; CRUEZET, N.; CATTANEO, J., "Properties of f-glucosidase purified from Clostridium thermocellum", J. GEN. MICROBIOL., (1982), vol. 128, pages 569 - 577 | - GROGAN, D.W., "Evidence that ß-galactosidase of Sulfolobus solfataricus is only one of several activities of a thermostable P-D-glycodiase", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1991), vol. 57, pages 1644 - 1649 | - CHAPLIN, M.F.; BUCKE, C., Enzyme Technology, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1990), pages 159 - 160 | - NILSSON, K.G.I., "Enzymatic synthesis of oligosaccharides", TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1988), vol. 6, pages 156 - 264 | - COTE, G.L.; TAO, B.Y., "Oligosaccharide synthesis by enzymatic transglycosylation", GLYCOCONJUGATE J., (1990), vol. 7, pages 145 - 162 | - HUBER, R. ET AL., "T. martima sp. nov. represents a new genus of unique extremely thermophilic eubacteria growing up to 90°C", ARCH. MICROBIOL., (1986), vol. 144, pages 324 - 333 | - MILLER, J.H., A SHORT COURSE IN BACTERIAL GENETICS, (1992), page 445 | - LEE, K.S., METCALF ET AL., "Evidence for two phosphonate degradative pathways in Enterobacter Aerogenes", J. BACTERIOL., (1992), vol. 174, pages 2501 - 2510 | - "Plasmid Vectors for Recovering and Exploiting Tn917 Transpositions in Bacillus and other Gram-Positive Bacteria", YOUNGMAN P., Plasmids: A Practical approach, IRL PRESS, (1987), pages 79 - 103 | - GLUZMAN, CELL, (1981), vol. 23, page 175 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - KOZBOR ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1983), vol. 4, page 72 | - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, INC., (1985), pages 77 - 96 | - "Methods for Measuring Cellulase Activities", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, vol. 160, pages 87 - 116 | - GOEDDEL, D. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1980), vol. 8, page 4057 | - GRAHAM, F.; VAN DER EB, A., VIROLOGY, (1973), vol. 52, pages 456 - 457 |