EP1977693 - Ultrasound diagnostic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Aloka Medical, Ltd. 6-22-1, Mure Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8622 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Hitachi Aloka Medical, Ltd. 6-22-1, Mure, Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8622 / JP | ||
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Aloka Co., Ltd. 6-22-1, Mure Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8622 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naruse, Naoyuki c/o Hitachi Aloka Medical, Ltd., 6-22-1, Mure Mitaka-shi, Tokyo, 181-8622 / JP | [2012/27] |
Former [2008/41] | 01 /
Naruse, Naoyuki c/o Aloka Co., Ltd. 6-22-1, Mure Mitaka-shi Tokyo, 181-8622 / JP | Representative(s) | Heim, Hans-Karl, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Heim, Hans-Karl, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08005852.2 | 27.03.2008 | [2008/41] | Priority number, date | JP20070100254 | 06.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007100254 | JP20070100270 | 06.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007100270 | JP20070100285 | 06.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007100285 | JP20070100300 | 06.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007100300 | JP20070100413 | 06.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007100413 | JP20070100420 | 06.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007100420 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977693 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977693 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
A61B8/00 (EP,US);
A61B8/462 (EP,US);
A61B8/467 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0431 (EP,US);
A61B8/4209 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/25] |
Former [2008/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Diagnostisches Ultraschallgerät | [2008/41] | English: | Ultrasound diagnostic apparatus | [2008/41] | French: | Appareil de diagnostic à ultrasons | [2008/41] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 09.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2011 | 30.06.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10014572.1 / EP2277451 | EP11005218.0 / EP2380497 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002181193 (AMEMIYA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-24 * page 3, paragraph 56 - page 4, paragraph 85 * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US6540685 (RHOADS PETER KOESTER [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * column 4, line 26 - column 7, line 9 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US6154359 (KAMIKAKAI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-24 * column 3, line 27 - column 6, line 37 * * figures 5,6A,6B,7,8 *; | [Y]US5268817 (MIYAGAWA SHIGENORI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-24 * column 5, line 62 - column 8, line 34 * * figures 7A-11B *; | [Y]US2004150963 (HOLMBERG RANDY T [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * page 4, paragraphs 37,38 * * figure 1c *; | [Y]US4842531 (TAKEMURA SHIGEKAZU [JP]) [Y] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]US4901261 (FUHS ERIC D [US]) [A] 6-8 * column 4, lines 27-34 * * column 5, lines 6-49 * * figures 1-15 *; | [A]US5383138 (MOTOYAMA HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 6-8 * column 12, line 63 - column 13, line 14 * * figure 23 *; | [A]GB2392709 (LEAR CORP [US]) [A] 9-14 * page 4, line 15 - page 8, line 12 * * figures 2-7 *; | [A]EP0463585 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 9-14 * column 5, lines 7-53 *; | [A]US2003236463 (MESAROS ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 17-20,24 * page 1, paragraph 15 - page 2, paragraph 20 * * figures 1-9c * | by applicant | JPH105221 | US2002181193 |