EP2105501 - Novel immunotherapy against neuronal and brain tumors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CY | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immatics Biotechnologies GmbH Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2009/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Emmerich, Niels 2943 N. Lincoln Avenue, Unit 213 Chicago, IL 60657 / US | 02 /
Singh, Harpreet Possartstr. 16 81679 München / DE | 03 /
Schoor Oliver Charlottenstrasse 21 72070 Tübingen / DE | 04 /
Hilf, Norbert Im Wengertacker 17 72138 Kirchentellinsfurt / DE | 05 /
Weinschenk, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | 06 /
Trautwein, Claudia Narzissenweg 4 42489 Wülfrath / DE | 07 /
Walter, Steffen Steinenbergstrasse 2 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [2014/01] |
Former [2013/50] | 01 /
Emmerich, Niels 2943 N. Lincoln Avenue, Unit 213 Chicago, IL 60657 / US | ||
02 /
Singh, Harpreet Possartstr. 16 81679 München / DE | |||
03 /
Schoor Oliver Charlottenstrasse 21 72070 Tübingen / DE | |||
04 /
Hilf, Norbert Im Wengertacker 17 72138 Kirchentellinsfurt / DE | |||
05 /
Weinschenk, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | |||
06 /
Trautwein, Claudia Narzissenweg 4 42489 Wülfrath / DE | |||
07 /
Walter, Steffen Blumenstrasse 1 72411 Dusslingen / DE | |||
Former [2013/43] | 01 /
Emmerich, Niels Schönbuchstrasse 34 72074 Tübingen-Bebenhausen / DE | ||
02 /
Singh, Harpreet Bei den Pferdeställen 9 72072 Tübingen / DE | |||
03 /
Schoor Oliver Charlottenstrasse 21 72070 Tübingen / DE | |||
04 /
Hilf, Norbert Im Wengertacker 17 72138 Kirchentellinsfurt / DE | |||
05 /
Weinschenk, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | |||
06 /
Trautwein, Claudia Narzissenweg 4 42489 Wülfrath / DE | |||
07 /
Walter, Steffen Blumenstrasse 1 72411 Dusslingen / DE | |||
Former [2009/46] | 01 /
Emmerich, Niels Schönbuchstrasse 34 72074 Tübingen-Bebenhausen / DE | ||
02 /
Singh, Harpreet Bei den Pferdeställen 9 72072 Tübingen / DE | |||
03 /
Schoor Oliver Charlottenstrasse 21 72070 Tübingen / DE | |||
04 /
Hilf, Norbert Im Wengertacker 17 72138 Kirchentellinsfurt / DE | |||
05 /
Weinschenk, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | |||
06 /
Trautwein, Claudia Nelkenweg 2 42489 Wülfrath / DE | |||
07 /
Walter, Steffen Blumenstrasse 1 72411 Dusslingen / DE | |||
Former [2009/40] | 01 /
Emmerich, Niels Schönbuchstrasse 34 72074 Tübingen-Bebenhausen / DE | ||
02 /
Singh, Harpreet Bei den Pferdeställen 9 72072 Tübingen / DE | |||
03 /
Schoor Oliver Charlottenstrasse 21 72070 Tübingen / DE | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/40] | Krauss, Jan Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08005889.4 | 27.03.2008 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2105501 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2105501 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/16, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, A61K39/00, A61P35/00 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
C07K14/4748 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/41] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 05.10.2009 | BA | 05.10.2009 | MK | 05.10.2009 | RS | 05.10.2009 | Title | German: | Neuartige Immuntherapie gegen Nerven- und Hirntumore | [2009/40] | English: | Novel immunotherapy against neuronal and brain tumors | [2009/40] | French: | Nouvelle immunothérapie pour le traitement de tumeurs neuronales et cérébrales | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.06.2015 | 09.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2017/49] |
Former [2016/50] | CY | 27.03.2016 | |
Former [2016/27] | deleted | ||
Former [2016/25] | LV | 07.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0075339 (COLD SPRING HARBOR LAB [US], et al) [X] 1-9* Sequence 32 100% with present sequences 1, 2, 3 and 7; sequence 25 100% identical with present sequence 8. *; | [DY]US2002146370 (MUELLER SABINE [US], et al) [DY] 1-18 * Abstract. *; | [DY]US2003118585 (MULLER SABINE [US], et al) [DY] 1-18 * Abstract. *; | [X]WO2005116051 (IMMATICS BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-18 * Abstract; p. 21, sequence 35 100% identical with present sequence 8; claims. *; | [DY] - MULHOLLAND PAUL J ET AL, "Genomic profiling identifies discrete deletions associated with translocations in glioblastoma multiforme.", CELL CYCLE (GEORGETOWN, TEX.) APR 2006, (200604), vol. 5, no. 7, ISSN 1551-4005, pages 783 - 791, XP002484251 [DY] 1-18 * Abstract. * | [X] - "Ptprz1 protein (Fragment).", UniProt, (20010601), Database accession no. Q99LN6, URL: EBI, XP002484252 [X] 1-9 * Sequence 100% identical with present sequence 1. * | Examination | WO2004085461 | - "Putative uncharacterized protein", UNIPROT, (20030301), Database accession no. Q8FID6, URL: EBI | - Kenneth Murphy ET AL, "Janeway's Immunobiology", Janeway's Immunobiology, Taylor & Francis, (20080102), pages 129 - 132, ISBN 978-0-81-534123-9, XP055049307 | - GILLES GUICHARD ET AL, "Efficient Binding of Reduced Peptide Bond Pseudopeptides to Major Histocompatibility Complex Class I Molecule", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, vol. 270, no. 44, doi:10.1074/JBC.270.44.26057, ISSN 0021-9258, (19951103), pages 26057 - 26059, (19951103), XP008153807 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.44.26057 | by applicant | US4440859 | US4530901 | US4582800 | US4677063 | US4678751 | US4704362 | US4710463 | US4757006 | US4766075 | US4810648 | US4897445 | WO9518145 | WO9726328 | US5849589 | US6406705 | US6455026 | US7060275 | WO2007028574 | EP1760088 | - NEUROL. MED. CHIR. (TOKYO, (1994), vol. 34, pages 91 - 94 | - NEUROL. MED. CHIR. (TOKYO, (1993), vol. 33, pages 425 - 458 | - NEUROPATHOLOGY, (1997), vol. 17, pages 186 - 188 | - MEZIERE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 159, pages 3230 - 3237 | - Current Protocols In Protein Science, JOHN WILEY & SONS, pages 1995 - 2000 | - COHEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1972), vol. 69, page 2110 | - BEGGS, NATURE, (1978), vol. 275, pages 104 - 109 | - ALLISON AC, "The mode of action of immunological adjuvants", DEV BIOL STAND., (1998), vol. 92, pages 3 - 11, XP000961024 | - ALTMAN JD ET AL., "Phenotypic analysis of antigen-specific T lymphocytes", SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, doi:doi:10.1126/science.274.5284.94, pages 94 - 96, XP002135711 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.274.5284.94 | - APPAY V ET AL., "Decreased specific CD8+ T cell cross-reactivity of antigen recognition following vaccination with Melan-A peptide", EUR. J IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 36, pages 1805 - 1814 | - ARIYAMA T ET AL., "Assignment of the human protein tyrosine phosphatase, receptor-type, zeta (PTPRZ) gene to chromosome band 7q31.3", CYTOGENET. CELL GENET., (1995), vol. 70, pages 52 - 54 | - BARNEA G ET AL., "Identification of a carbonic anhydrase-like domain in the extracellular region of RPTP gamma defines a new subfamily of receptor tyrosine phosphatases", MOL. CELL BIOL., (1993), vol. 13, pages 1497 - 1506 | - BOYTON RJ ET AL., "Glutamic acid decarboxylase T lymphocyte responses associated with susceptibility or resistance to type I diabetes: analysis in disease discordant human twins, non-obese diabetic mice and HLA-DQ transgenic mice", INT. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1093/intimm/10.12.1765, pages 1765 - 1776, XP000978516 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/intimm/10.12.1765 | - BRUCKDORFER T; MARDER 0; ALBERICIO F., "From production of peptides in milligram amounts for research to multi-ton quantities for drugs of the future", CURR PHARM BIOTECHNOL. FEB, (2004), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:doi:10.2174/1389201043489620, pages 29 - 43, XP009063837 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1389201043489620 | - BRUNSVIG PF ET AL., "Telomerase peptide vaccination: a phase I/II study in patients with non-small cell lung cancer", CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER., (2006), vol. 55, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1007/s00262-006-0145-7, pages 1553 - 1564, XP019422504 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00262-006-0145-7 | - BURTON EC; PRADOS MD, "Malignant gliomas", CURR. TREAT. OPTIONS. ONCOL, (2000), vol. 1, pages 459 - 468, XP001147220 | - CHEEVER MA ET AL., "T-cell immunity to oncogenic proteins including mutated ras and chimeric bcr-abl", ANN N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (1993), vol. 690, pages 101 - 112 | - COLOMBETTI S ET AL., "Prolonged TCR/CD28 engagement drives IL-2-independent T cell clonal expansion through signaling mediated by the mammalian target ofrapamycin", J IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 176, pages 2730 - 2738 | - CRESSWELL P, "Assembly, transport, and function of MHC class II molecules", ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 12, pages 259 - 293 | - DAZZI C ET AL., "A sequential chemo- radiotherapeutic treatment for patients with malignant gliomas: a phase II pilot study", ANTICANCER RES., (2000), vol. 20, pages 515 - 518 | - DENGJEL J ET AL., "Unexpected Abundance of HLA Class II Presented Peptides in Primary Renal Cell Carcinomas", CLIN CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 12, pages 4163 - 4170 | - DIX AR ET AL., "Immune defects observed in patients with primary malignant brain tumors", J NEUROIMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 100, pages 216 - 232 | - DUDLEY ME ET AL., "Cancer regression and autoimmunity in patients after clonal repopulation with antitumor lymphocytes", SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 298, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1076514, pages 850 - 854, XP009113075 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1076514 | - DUDLEY ME ET AL., "Adoptive cell transfer therapy following non-myeloablative but lymphodepleting chemotherapy for the treatment of patients with refractory metastatic melanoma", J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2005), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1200/JCO.2005.00.240, pages 2346 - 2357, XP002433186 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2005.00.240 | - DUPUIS M ET AL., "Dendritic cells internalize vaccine adjuvant after intramuscular injection", CELL IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 186, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1006/cimm.1998.1283, pages 18 - 27, XP029583042 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cimm.1998.1283 | - FALK,K. ET AL., "Allele-specific motifs revealed by sequencing of self-peptides eluted from MHC molecules", NATURE, (1991), vol. 351, doi:doi:10.1038/351290a0, pages 290 - 296, XP000310533 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/351290a0 | - FONG L ET AL., "Dendritic cells injected via different routes induce immunity in cancer patients", J. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 166, pages 4254 - 4259 | - FONG L ET AL., "Altered peptide ligand vaccination with Flt3 ligand expanded dendritic cells for tumor immunotherapy", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A, (2001), vol. 98, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.141226398, pages 8809 - 8814, XP003001078 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.141226398 | - GABRILOVICH DI; CUNNINGHAM HT; CARBONE DP, "IL-12 and mutant P53 peptide-pulsed dendritic cells for the specific immunotherapy of cancer", J IMMUNOTHER EMPHASIS TUMOR IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 6, pages 414 - 418 | - GALON J ET AL., "Type, density, and location of immune cells within human colorectal tumors predict clinical outcome", SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 313, doi:doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1129139, pages 1960 - 1964, XP002684010 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/SCIENCE.1129139 | - GATTINONI L ET AL., "Adoptive immunotherapy for cancer: building on success", NAT. REV. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/nri1842, pages 383 - 393, XP002607145 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri1842 | - GEBBINK MF ET AL., "Cloning, expression and chromosomal localization of a new putative receptor-like protein tyrosine phosphatase", FEBS LETT., (1991), vol. 290, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-5793(91)81241-Y, pages 123 - 130, XP055083157 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(91)81241-Y | - GNJATIC S ET AL., "Survey of naturally occurring CD4+ T cell responses against NY-ESO-1 in cancer patients: correlation with antibody responses", PROC NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A, (2003), vol. 100, pages 8862 - 8867 | - HAMMER J ET AL., "Peptide binding specificity ofHLA-DR4 molecules: correlation with rheumatoid arthritis association", J EXP. MED, (1995), vol. 181, pages 1847 - 1855 | - HANADA K; YEWDELL JW; YANG JC, "Immune recognition of a human renal cancer antigen through post-translational protein splicing", NATURE, (2004), vol. 427, pages 252 - 256 | - HARROCH S ET AL., "A critical role for the protein tyrosine phosphatase receptor type Z in functional recovery from demyelinating lesions", NAT. GENET., (2002), vol. 32, doi:doi:10.1038/ng1004, pages 411 - 414, XP002329234 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng1004 | - HEIMBERGER AB ET AL., "Tumor-specific peptide vaccination in newly- diagnosed patients with GBM", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, 2006 ASCO ANNUAL MEETING PROCEEDINGS PART I, (20060620), vol. 24, no. 18, page 2529 | - HILL ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1995), vol. 181, pages 2221 - 2228 | - JEROME ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, pages 1654 - 1662 | - JOCHMUS ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1997), vol. 78, pages 1689 - 1695 | - JUNG G; LEDBETTER JA; MULLER-EBERHARD HJ, "Induction of cytotoxicity in resting human T lymphocytes bound to tumor cells by antibody heteroconjugates", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1987), vol. 84, pages 4611 - 4615 | - KAPLAN R ET AL., "Cloning of three human tyrosine phosphatases reveals a multigene family of receptor-linked protein-tyrosine-phosphatases expressed in brain", PROC NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A, (1990), vol. 87, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.87.18.7000, pages 7000 - 7004, XP002953383 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.18.7000 | - KARRE; LJUNGGREN, J. EXP. MED., (1985), vol. 162, page 1745 | - KAWAKAMI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 638 - 643 | - KENNEDY RC ET AL., "CD4+ T lymphocytes play a critical role in antibody production and tumor immunity against simian virus 40 large tumor antigen", CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 63, pages 1040 - 1045 | - KOBAYASHI H ET AL., "Identification of an antigenic epitope for helper T lymphocytes from carcinoembryonic antigen", CLIN CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 8, pages 3219 - 3225 | - ARTHUR M. KRIEG, "Therapeutic potential of Toll-like receptor 9 activation", NATURE REVIEWS, DRUG DISCOVERY, (2006), vol. 5, pages 471 - 484 | - KRUEGER NX; STREULI M; SAITO H, "Structural diversity and evolution of human receptor-like protein tyrosine phosphatases", EMBO J, (1990), vol. 9, pages 3241 - 3252, XP002034366 | - LEMMEL C ET AL., "Differential quantitative analysis of MHC ligands by mass spectrometry using stable isotope labeling", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt947, pages 450 - 454, XP002359085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt947 | - LEVY JB ET AL., "The cloning of a receptor-type protein tyrosine phosphatase expressed in the central nervous system", J BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 10573 - 10581 | - LONGENECKER ET AL., ANN. NY ACAD. SCI., (1993), vol. 690, pages 276 - 291 | - LU ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1981), vol. 46, page 3433 | - LU KV ET AL., "Differential induction of glioblastoma migration and growth by two forms of pleiotrophin", J BIOL CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, doi:doi:10.1074/JBC.M502614200, pages 26953 - 26964, XP002514091 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M502614200 | - MACDONALD DR, "Temozolomide for recurrent high-grade glioma", SEMIN. ONCOL, (2001), vol. 28, pages 3 - 12 | - MACH B ET AL., "Regulation of MHC class II genes: lessons from a disease", ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 301 - 331 | - A MAHDAVI; BJ MONK, "Recent advances in human papillomavirus vaccines", CURR ONCOL REP, (2006), vol. 6, pages 465 - 472 | - MALCHEREK G ET AL., "Analysis of allele-specific contact sites of natural HLA-DR17 ligands", J IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 153, pages 1141 - 1149, XP002025352 | - MANICI S ET AL., "Melanoma cells present a MAGE-3 epitope to CD4(+) cytotoxic T cells in association with histocompatibility leukocyte antigen DR11", J EXP. MED, (1999), vol. 189, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.189.5.871, pages 871 - 876, XP002165456 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.189.5.871 | - MULHOLLAND PJ ET AL., "Genomic profiling-identifies discrete deletions associated with translocations in glioblastoma multiforme", CELL CYCLE, (2006), vol. 5, pages 783 - 791, XP002484251 | - STRUBIN, M.; MACH, B.; LONG, E.O., "The complete sequence of the mRNA for the HLA-DR-associated invariant chain reveals a polypeptide with an unusual transmembrane polarity", EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 869 - 872 | - NAPOLITANO M ET AL., "Treatment of supratentorial glioblastoma multiforme with radiotherapy and a combination of BCNU and tamoxifen: a phase II study", J NEUROONCOL., (1999), vol. 45, pages 229 - 235 | - NIEDER C; GROSU AL; MOLLS M, "A comparison of treatment results for recurrent malignant gliomas", CANCER TREAT. REV., (2000), vol. 26, doi:doi:10.1053/ctrv.2000.0191, pages 397 - 409, XP001071041 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/ctrv.2000.0191 | - NOVELLINO L; CASTELLI C; PARMIANI G, "A listing of human tumor antigens recognized by T cells: March 2004 update", CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (2005), vol. 54, doi:doi:10.1007/s00262-004-0560-6, pages 187 - 207, XP019333092 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00262-004-0560-6 | - PASCOLO S., "Vaccination with messenger RNA", METHODS MOL MED, (2006), vol. 127, pages 23 - 40, XP009117840 | - PEOPLES ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 432 - 436 | - PEREZ-PINERA P ET AL., "The receptor protein tyrosine phosphatase (RPTP)beta/zeta is expressed in different subtypes of human breast cancer", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2007), vol. 362, pages 5 - 10 | - PLEBANSKI ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 25, pages 1783 - 1787 | - PORTA ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1994), vol. 202, pages 449 - 955 | - PRADOS MD; LEVIN V, "Biology and treatment of malignant glioma", SEMIN. ONCOL, (2000), vol. 27, pages 1 - 10 | - QIN Z; BLANKENSTEIN T, "CD4+ T cell--mediated tumor rejection involves inhibition of angiogenesis that is dependent on IFN gamma receptor expression by nonhematopoietic cells", IMMUNITY., (2000), vol. 12, pages 677 - 686 | - QIN Z ET AL., "A critical requirement of interferon gamma-mediated angiostasis for tumor rejection by CD8+ T cells", CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 63, pages 4095 - 4100 | - RAMMENSEE HG ET AL., "SYFPEITHI: database for MHC ligands and peptide motifs", IMMUNOGENETICS, (1999), vol. 50, doi:doi:10.1007/s002510050595, pages 213 - 219, XP002254433 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002510050595 | - RINI BI ET AL., "Combination immunotherapy with prostatic acid phosphatase pulsed antigen-presenting cells (Provenge) plus bevacizumab in patients with serologic progression of prostate cancer after definitive local therapy", CANCER., (2006), vol. 107, no. 1, pages 67 - 74 | - ROSENBERG SA ET AL., "A progress report on the treatment of 157 patients with advanced cancer using lymphokine-activated killer cells and interleukin-2 or high-dose interleukin-2 alone", N. ENGL. J. MED., (1987), vol. 316, pages 889 - 897, XP001118518 | - ROSENBERG SA ET AL., "Use of tumor-infiltrating lymphocytes and interleukin-2 in the immunotherapy of patients with metastatic melanoma. A preliminary report", N. ENGL. J MED, (1988), vol. 319, pages 1676 - 1680, XP009032797 | - ROTH W; WELLER M, "Chemotherapy and immunotherapy of malignant glioma: molecular mechanisms and clinical perspectives", CELL MOL. LIFE SCI., (1999), vol. 56, pages 481 - 506 | - SABLOTZKI A ET AL., "Dysregulation of immune response following neurosurgical operations", ACTA ANAESTHESIOL. SCAND., (2000), vol. 44, pages 82 - 87 | - SAIKI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 487 - 491 | - SMALL EJ ET AL., "Placebo-controlled phase 3 trial of immunologic therapy with sipuleucel-T (APC8015) in patients with metastatic, asymptomatic hormone refractory prostate cancer", J CLIN ONCOL., (2006), vol. 24, no. 19, pages 3089 - 3094 | - SCHUBERT U ET AL., "Rapid degradation of a large fraction of newly synthesized proteins by proteasomes", NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, pages 770 - 774 | - SEEGER,F.H. ET AL., "The HLA-A*6601 peptide motif: prediction by pocket structure and verification by peptide analysis.", IMMUNOGENETICS, (1999), vol. 49, pages 571 - 576 | - SHEDLOCK DJ; SHEN H, "Requirement for CD4 T cell help in generating functional CD8 T cell memory", SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 300, pages 337 - 339 | - SINGH-JASUJA H; EMMERICH NP; RAMMENSEE HG, "The Tubingen approach: identification, selection, and validation of tumor-associated HLA peptides for cancer therapy", CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (2004), vol. 53, pages 187 - 195 | - M. STAEHLER ET AL., "An open label study to evaluate the safety and immunogenicity of the peptide based cancer vaccine IMA901", ASCO, (2007), vol. 3017 | - R. STAN; JD WOLCHOK; AD COHEN, "DNA vaccines against cancer", HEMATOL ONCOL CLIN NORTH AM, (2006), vol. 3, pages 613 - 636 | - SUN JC; BEVAN MJ, "Defective CD8 T cell memory following acute infection without CD4 T cell help", SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 300, pages 339 - 342 | - SYLVESTER-HVID C ET AL., "Establishment of a quantitative ELISA capable of determining peptide - MHC class I interaction", TISSUE ANTIGENS, (2002), vol. 59, doi:doi:10.1034/j.1399-0039.2002.590402.x, pages 251 - 258, XP055006262 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1399-0039.2002.590402.x | - TOMPKINS SM ET AL., "A europium fluoroimmunoassay for measuring binding of antigen to class II MHC glycoproteins", J IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1993), vol. 163, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-1759(93)90124-P, pages 209 - 216, XP023974966 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(93)90124-P | - VAN DER BRUGGEN P ET AL., "A gene encoding an antigen recognized by cytolytic T lymphocytes on a human melanoma", SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1840703, pages 1643 - 1647, XP002628352 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1840703 | - VIGNERON N ET AL., "An antigenic peptide produced by peptide splicing in the proteasome", SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 304, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1095522, pages 587 - 590, XP002590787 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1095522 | - VOGT AB ET AL., "Ligand motifs ofHLA-DRB5*0101 and DRB1*1501 molecules delineated from self-peptides", J IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 153, pages 1665 - 1673, XP002245824 | - WALTER S ET AL., "Cutting edge: predetermined avidity of human CD8 T cells expanded on calibrated MHC/anti-CD28-coated microspheres", J. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 171, pages 4974 - 4978 | - WANG JC; LIVINGSTONE AM, "Cutting edge: CD4+ T cell help can be essential for primary CD8+ T cell responses in vivo", J IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 171, pages 6339 - 6343 | - WANG V ET AL., "Differential gene up- regulation by hypoxia-inducible factor-lalpha and hypoxia-inducible factor-2alpha in HEK293T cells", CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, pages 3299 - 3306 | - WEINSCHENK T ET AL., "Integrated functional genomics approach for the design of patient-individual antitumor vaccines", CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 62, pages 5818 - 5827 | - WU CW ET AL., "Protein tyrosine-phosphatase expression profiling in gastric cancer tissues", CANCER LETT., (2006), vol. 242, doi:doi:10.1016/j.canlet.2005.10.046, pages 95 - 103, XP025021733 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.canlet.2005.10.046 | - YEE C ET AL., "Adoptive T cell therapy using antigen-specific CD8+ T cell clones for the treatment of patients with metastatic melanoma: in vivo persistence, migration, and antitumor effect of transferred T cells", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A, (2002), vol. 99, doi:doi:10.1073/PNAS.242600099, pages 16168 - 16173, XP002505178 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.242600099 | - ZAREMBA S ET AL., "Identification of an enhancer agonist cytotoxic T lymphocyte peptide from human carcinoembryonic antigen", CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, pages 4570 - 4577, XP002096107 | - ZEH HJ, III ET AL., "High avidity CTLs for two self-antigens demonstrate superior in vitro and in vivo antitumor efficacy", J IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 162, pages 989 - 994, XP002133806 |