EP1955996 - 7, 9-Substituted tetracycline compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paratek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Kneeland Street Boston, MA 02111 / US | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hawkins, Paul 320 Artist Road, n°64 Santa Fe, New Mexico 87501 / US | 02 /
Bhatia, Beena 3 Brian Lane Mansfield Massachusetts 02048 / US | 03 /
Warchol, Tad 177 South Street Northborough Massachusetts 01532 / US | 04 /
Nelson, Mark, L. 47 Barnstable Road Norfolk Massachusetts 02056 / US | 05 /
Frechette, Roger 40 Estate Lane Reading Massachusetts 01867 / US | 06 /
Viski, Peter 887 West Roxbury Parkway Chestnut Hill Massachusetts 02467 / US | 07 /
Ismail, Mohamed 5 Hunt Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | 08 /
Bowser, Todd 88 Haggerty Road Charlton Massachusetts 01507 / US | 09 /
McIntyre, Laura 94 Shavian Boulevard London Ontario N6G 2P3 / CA | 10 /
Reddy, Laxma 49 Eldred Street Lexington Massachusetts 02420 / US | 11 /
Stapleton, Karen 36 Bradmere Way Weymouth Massachusetts 02191 / US | 12 /
Sheahan, Paul 203 Hayden Rowe Street Hopkinton Massachusetts 01748 / US | [2010/02] |
Former [2009/45] | 01 /
Hawkins, Paul 320 Artist Road, n°64 Santa Fe, New Mexico 87501 / US | ||
02 /
Bhatia, Beena 3 Brian Lane Mansfield Massachusetts 02048 / US | |||
03 /
Warchol, Tad 177 South Street Northborough Massachusetts 01532 / US | |||
04 /
Nelson, Mark, L. 47 Barnstable Road Norfolk Massachusetts 02056 / US | |||
05 /
Frechette, Roger 40 Estate Lane Reading Massachusetts 01867 / US | |||
06 /
Viski, Peter 887 West Roxbury Parkway Chestnut Hill Massachusetts 02467 / US | |||
07 /
Ismail, Mohamed 5 Hunt Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | |||
08 /
Bowser, Todd 88 Haggerty Road Charlton Massachusetts 01507 / US | |||
09 /
McIntyre, Laura 94 Shavian Boulevard London Ontario N6G 2P3 / CA | |||
10 /
Reddy, Laxma 49 Eldred Street Lexington Massachusetts 02420 / US | |||
11 /
Stapleton, Karen 36 Bradmere Way Weymouth Massachusetts 02191 / US | |||
12 /
Sheahan, Paul 103 Hayden Rowe Street Hopkinton Massachusetts 07148 / US | |||
Former [2009/17] | 01 /
Hawkins, Paul 205 Walden Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US | ||
02 /
Bhatia, Beena 3 Brian Lane Mansfield Massachusetts 02048 / US | |||
03 /
Warchol, Tad 177 South Street Northborough Massachusetts 01532 / US | |||
04 /
Nelson, Mark, L. 47 Barnstable Road Norfolk Massachusetts 02056 / US | |||
05 /
Frechette, Roger 40 Estate Lane Reading Massachusetts 01867 / US | |||
06 /
Viski, Peter 887 West Roxbury Parkway Chestnut Hill Massachusetts 02467 / US | |||
07 /
Ismail, Mohamed 5 Hunt Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | |||
08 /
Bowser, Todd 88 Haggerty Road Charlton Massachusetts 01507 / US | |||
09 /
McIntyre, Laura 94 Shavian Boulevard London Ontario N6G 2P3 / CA | |||
10 /
Reddy, Laxma 49 Eldred Street Lexington Massachusetts 02420 / US | |||
11 /
Stapleton, Karen 36 Bradmere Way Weymouth Massachusetts 02191 / US | |||
12 /
Sheahan, Paul 103 Hayden Rowe Street Hopkington Massachusetts 01748 / US | |||
Former [2008/33] | 01 /
Hawkins, Paul 41 Wassburn Avenue No. 3 Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US | ||
02 /
Bhatia, Beena 3 Brian Lane Mansfield Massachusetts 02048 / US | |||
03 /
Warchol, Tad 177 South Street Northborough Massachusetts 01532 / US | |||
04 /
Nelson, Mark, L. 735 Worchester Road Wellesley Massachusetts 02481 / US | |||
05 /
Frechette, Roger 40 Estate Lane Reading Massachusetts 01867 / US | |||
06 /
Viski, Peter 887 West Roxbury Parkway Brookline Massachusetts 02467 / US | |||
07 /
Ismail, Mohamed 5 Hunt Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | |||
08 /
Bowser, Todd 88 Haggerty Road Charlton Massachusetts 01507 / US | |||
09 /
McIntyre, Laura Apartment 2 188 Franklin Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | |||
10 /
Reddy, Laxma 49 Alfred Street Lexington Massachusetts 02420 / US | |||
11 /
Stapleton, Karen 36 Bradmere Way Weymouth Massachusetts 02191 / US | |||
12 /
Sheahan, Paul 103 Hayden Rowe Street Hopkinton Massachusetts 01748 / US | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol, BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08005899.3 | 29.06.2001 | [2008/33] | Priority number, date | US20010275620P | 13.03.2001 Original published format: US 275620 P | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955996 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C237/26, A61K31/65 | [2008/33] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/33] | Extension states | AL | 13.02.2009 | LT | 13.02.2009 | LV | 13.02.2009 | MK | 13.02.2009 | RO | 13.02.2009 | SI | 13.02.2009 | Title | German: | 7, 9-substituierte Tetracyclin-Verbindungen | [2008/33] | English: | 7, 9-Substituted tetracycline compounds | [2008/33] | French: | Composés de tétracycline substitués en position 7, 9 | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 13.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/50] | 27.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01950651.8 / EP1368305 | Divisional application(s) | EP10184559.2 / EP2301913 | EP10184615.2 / EP2301914 | EP10184631.9 / EP2298732 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010950651) is 27.04.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3338963 (JOSEPH PETISI, et al) [Y] 1-4,9-11,19-26 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US3433834 (WINTERBOTTOM ROBERT, et al) [Y] 1-4,9-11,19-26 * claim 1 *; | [Y]DE2346535 (FARMACEUTICI ITALIA [IT]) [Y] 1-4,9-11,19-26 * page 2; example 6; claims 5,9 *; | [Y]DE2527568 (FARMACEUTICI ITALIA) [Y] 1-4,9-11,19-26 * claims 5,7,10,11,17,19 *; | [Y]WO0028983 (COLLAGENEX PHARM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,4,19-26* claims 1-4 *; | [Y] - KOZA D J, SYNTHESIS OF 7-SUBSTITUTED TETRACYCLINE DERIVATIVES, ORGANIC LETTERS, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, PAGE(S) 815 - 817, (20000301), ISSN 1523-7060, XP000926764 [Y] 1-4,9-11,19-26 * page 815; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol005557y | by applicant | US2980584 | US2990331 | US3062717 | US3165531 | US3338963 | US3433834 | US3454697 | US3557280 | US3674859 | DE2346535 | DE2527568 | US3957980 | US4018889 | US4024272 | US4126680 | US5532227 | US5789395 | US5834450 | WO0028983 | - "Synthesis of 7-substituted tetracycline derivatives", KOZA D J, Organic Letters, ACS, (20000301), pages 815 - 817 | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - VAN DER BOZERT ET AL., CANCER RES., (1988), vol. 48, pages 6686 - 6690 | - WAITZ, J.A., National Commission for Clinical Laboratory Standards, (1990), vol. 10, pages 13 - 20 |