EP1940208 - Multi-piece substrate and method of manufacturing the substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBIDEN CO., LTD. 1, Kanda-cho 2-chome Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503-8604 / JP | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yanase, Makoto c/o Ibiden Electronics Co., Ltd. 300 Aoyanagi-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu 503-8503 / JP | 02 /
Sagisaka, Katsumi c/o Ibiden Co., Ltd. 300 Aoyanagi-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu 503-8503 / JP | 03 /
Shimada, Isao c/o Ibiden Co., Ltd. 300 Aoyanagi-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu 503-8503 / JP | 04 /
Okunishi, Tatsuya c/o Ibiden Co., Ltd. 300 Aoyanagi-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu 503-8503 / JP | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Uchida, Kenji, et al Cabinet Fedit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/27] | Jackson, Martin Peter J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08006173.2 | 31.05.2001 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | JP20010087620 | 26.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001087620 | JP20010087635 | 26.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001087635 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1940208 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1940208 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/00, H05K1/02 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
H05K3/0052 (EP,US);
H05K3/0097 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09063 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0909 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0165 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0169 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/27] | H05K3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2008/27] | Title | German: | Mehrteiliges Substrat und Verfahren zur Herstellung des Substrats | [2008/27] | English: | Multi-piece substrate and method of manufacturing the substrate | [2008/27] | French: | Substrat par lot et procédé de fabrication du substrat | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 12.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 26.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01934477.9 / EP1313357 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010934477) is 06.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6448489 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-25 * abstract *; | [X]JPH0563073U (NIPPON CHEMI-CON CORPORATION) [X] 1-25 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0015]; figure 1 *; | [X]JPH09172232 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-25 * abstract *; | [X]JPH1012993 (ROHM CO LTD) [X] 1-25 * abstract *; | [X]GB2326982 (VIASYSTEMS TAMWORTH LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1-25 * page 6, line 12 - page 19, line 4; figures 1-5 *; | [X]JPH11307905 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-25 * abstract *; | [X]JP2000252605 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH) [X] 1-25* abstract * | Examination | US5866852 |