17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
04.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
10.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
21.06.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
19.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
08.03.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
22.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
15.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
01.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
25.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
25.01.2013 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
13.07.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
06.07.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.07.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.02.2012 |
Change: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.01.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.06.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
17.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.10.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.09.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.06.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] |
28.05.2010 |
Change - first examination report |
published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] |
26.05.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.05.2010 |
First examination report |
|
04.05.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.04.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
16.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2009 |
Publication of search report |
published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
17.07.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
12.11.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |