EP1977947 - Vehicle travel control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/39] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawamoto, Kiichiro c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08006601.2 | 31.03.2008 | [2008/41] | Priority number, date | JP20070098140 | 04.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007098140 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1977947 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1977947 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977947 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/16, B60K31/00 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
B60W30/16 (EP,US);
B60K31/0008 (EP,US);
B60W2520/10 (EP,US);
B60W2520/14 (EP,US);
B60W2540/18 (EP);
B60W2554/4042 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/41] | B60W30/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2010/07] |
Former [2008/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugfahrtsteuerungsvorrichtung | [2008/41] | English: | Vehicle travel control apparatus | [2008/41] | French: | Appareil de contrôle de voyage de véhicule | [2008/41] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0657857 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 50 - page 8, line 23; figures 5,9,10 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]WO0221156 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [Y] 2 * page 12, column 24 - page 13, column 5 *; | [A]US2005010351 (WAGNER KLAUS-PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0023] *; | [A]WO0179013 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 7, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [YA]US2005251323 (HEINRICHS-BARTSCHER SASCHA [DE]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0018] * [A] 1; | [A]US2004117090 (SAMUKAWA YOSHIE [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0010] * | by applicant | EP0657857 | WO0221156 |