EP1947786 - Pre-emphasis method in an optical communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Takeshi Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Tomofuji, Hiroaki Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Onaka, Hiroshi Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Sekiya, Motoyoshi Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Yamane, Kazuo Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 06 /
Terahara, Takafumi Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 07 /
Murakami, Makato Fujitsu Hokkaido Digital Technology 4-3-1, Nishi Kita 7-jo Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 060-0807 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | 01 /
Sakamoto, Takeshi Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Tomofuji, Hiroaki Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Onaka, Hiroshi Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
Sekiya, Motoyoshi Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
05 /
Yamane, Kazuo Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
06 /
Terahara, Takafumi Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
07 /
Murakami, Makato Fujitsu Hokkaido Digital Technology 4-3-1, Nishi Kita 7-jo Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 606-0807 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08006797.8 | 20.11.2000 | [2008/30] | Priority number, date | JP20000009387 | 18.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000009387 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1947786 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1947786 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/079 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
H04B10/07953 (EP,US);
H04B10/0799 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | H04B10/08, H04B10/17 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/30] | Title | German: | Präemphase-Verfahren in einem optischen Kommunikationssystem | [2008/30] | English: | Pre-emphasis method in an optical communication system | [2008/30] | French: | Procédé de pré-emphase dans un système de communications optique | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 20.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/39] | 09.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00124366.6 / EP1130803 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000124366) is 05.07.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 04.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0762677 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 5, line 27 - page 8, line 54 * * figures 5,8-12B *; | [A]FR2756693 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 4, line 13 - page 6, line 23 * * page 13, line 16 - page 15, line 6 *; | [A]EP0897205 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0021] - [0043] - [0053] - [0074] - [0077] * * figures 6,12 *; | [A] - MUYS W ET AL, "A 50-CHANNEL EXTERNALLY MODULATED AM-VSB VIDEO DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM WITH THREE CASCADED EDFA'S PROVIDING 50-DB POWER BUDGET OVER 30 KM OF STANDARD SINGLE-MODE FIBER", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19950601), vol. 7, no. 6, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 691 - 693, XP000510215 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.388767 | [A] - PETERMANN K., Laser diode modulation and noise, DORDRECHT, NL, KUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1988), XP002262380 [A] 1-7 * page 154 - page 157 * | [A] - TONGUZ O K ET AL, "GAIN EQUALIZATION OF EDFA CASCADES", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19971001), vol. 15, no. 10, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 1832 - 1841, XP000703598 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.633567 | [A] - DIMOPOULOS C ET AL, "Evolution of SNR during power transients in chains of saturated and gain equalised EDFAs", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19990930), vol. 35, no. 20, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1756 - 1758, XP006012735 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19991159 | by applicant | FR2756693 |