EP1977694 - Ultrasound system and method of forming an ultrasound image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDISON CO., LTD. 114 Yangdukwon-ri, Nam-myun Hongchun-gun Kangwon-do 250-870 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MEDISON CO., LTD. 114, Yangdukwon-ri, Nam-myun, Hongchun-gun Kangwon-do 250-870 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kye, Sang Bum 3FL, R&D center, Medison Co., Ltd Discusser & Medison Building 1003 Daechi-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-280 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Han Woo 3FL, R&D center, Medison Co., Ltd Discusser & Medison Building 1003 Daechi-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-280 / KR | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08006831.5 | 04.04.2008 | [2008/41] | Priority number, date | KR20070034310 | 06.04.2007 Original published format: KR 20070034310 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977694 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/06 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
A61B8/00 (KR);
A61B8/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61B8/13 (EP,US);
A61B8/467 (EP,US);
A61B8/469 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2009/25] |
Former [2008/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ultraschallsystem und Verfahren zum Erzeugen von Ultraschallbildern | [2008/41] | English: | Ultrasound system and method of forming an ultrasound image | [2008/41] | French: | Système et procédé à ultrasons pour former une image ultrasonore | [2008/41] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6068598 (PAN LIHONG [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 2, lines 46-59 * * column 3, lines 18-41 * * column 5, line 28 - column 8, line 15; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US2005090747 (CLARK DAVID W [US]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0004] - [0010] * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1152364 (GE MED SYS GLOBAL TECH CO LLC [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0036] * * paragraph [0050] * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5690116 (GOUJON ANTOINE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, lines 6-11 * * column 5, lines 38-50 * * column 7, line 32 - column 13, line 29 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5555886 (WENG LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 1, lines 9-14 * * column 4, lines 6-63 * * column 6, lines 12-63 * * figures 1-3 * |