EP1983274 - Ground probe for extracting thermal energy from the ground and/or releasing thermal energy to the ground [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jansen AG Industriestrasse 34 9463 Oberriet / CH | [2012/14] |
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states amasond Produktion GmbH & Co KG Steinebach 18 6850 Dornbirn / AT | ||
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states A & S Umwelttechnologie AG Weissbadstrasse 14 9050 Appenzell / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amann, Armin, Ing. Seilergasse 4 6824 Schlins / AT | 02 /
Sonderegger, Wilhelm, Dr. Oberer Kirchweg 7a 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Ralf U. Hofmann & Fechner Patentanwälte Hörnlingerstrasse 3 Postfach 5 6830 Rankweil / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Hofmann, Ralf U. Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 6806 Feldkirch / AT | Application number, filing date | 08007295.2 | 14.04.2008 | [2008/43] | Priority number, date | AT20070000589 | 17.04.2007 Original published format: AT 5892007 | [2008/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1983274 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1983274 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24J3/08, E21B7/20 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
E21B7/205 (EP);
E21B17/076 (EP);
F24T10/17 (EP);
F24T2010/53 (EP);
F28F2275/085 (EP);
Y02E10/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/43] | F24J3/08 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2015/47] |
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Erdsonde zur Aufnahme von thermischer Energie aus dem Erdreich und/oder zur Abgabe von thermischer Energie an das Erdreich | [2008/43] | English: | Ground probe for extracting thermal energy from the ground and/or releasing thermal energy to the ground | [2008/43] | French: | Sonde souterraine destinée à l'extraction d'énergie thermique du sol et/ou à l'apport d'énergie thermique au sol | [2008/43] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 20.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]US4286651 (STEIGER DOUGLASS W, et al) [XD] 1,2,4,5,7,12,13 * column 2, line 11 - column 4, line 4; figures 1-5 * [Y] 3,6,8-11,15; | [X]FR2431004 (VIGNAL MAURICE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,12-14 * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 1; figure 5 *; | [X]US3261412 (ADALBERT LOB) [X] 12,14 * column 1, line 22 - line 69; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]DE102004039107 (ANNELIESE ZEMENTWERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0044] *; | [Y]US4340245 (STALDER JOHN L) [Y] 6 * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 43; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE453210 (BETON U TIEFBAU GES MAST M B H) [Y] 8-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US102572 (MC MILLAN) [Y] 15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3314689 (WALDNER ALFRED) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 11 - column 6, line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2072320 (MOLSNER HERMANN DIETRICH) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 6 - line 39; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR1277369 (S T V VIBRATECHNIQUES) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1486741 | US4286651 | EP0582118 | EP1006322 |