EP1952878 - Exhaust gas purifying catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takaya, Masahiro 1-40-20 Futaba Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Shinji 1-44-15 Koyabe Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Hiramoto, Yoshiaki 3-43-1-1401 Oppamahigashi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08007323.2 | 28.10.2002 | [2008/32] | Priority number, date | JP20010336227 | 01.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001336227 | JP20010336188 | 01.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001336188 | JP20020294435 | 08.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002294435 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1952878 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, F01N3/08 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01D53/9454 (EP,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,US);
B01J37/0244 (EP,US);
B01J37/0246 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N3/0814 (EP,US);
F01N3/0835 (EP,US);
F01N3/2828 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1025 (EP,US);
B01D2255/206 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20715 (EP,US);
B01D2255/502 (EP,US);
B01D2255/902 (EP,US);
B01D2255/908 (EP,US);
B01D2255/912 (EP,US);
B01D2255/92 (EP,US);
B01D53/9477 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
F01N2370/04 (EP,US);
F01N2510/06 (EP,US);
F01N2510/0682 (EP,US);
F01N2510/0684 (EP,US);
F01N2570/16 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/32] | Title | German: | Abgasreinigungskatalysator | [2008/32] | English: | Exhaust gas purifying catalyst | [2008/32] | French: | Catalyseur pour la purification de gaz d'échappement | [2009/15] |
Former [2008/32] | Gaz d'échappement purifiant le catalyseur | Examination procedure | 24.06.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02024053.7 / EP1308200 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JPH0256247 | JPH0559942 | JPH0674019 | JPH06142457 | JPH0796183 | JPH07102957 | JPH07144119 | JPH11210451 |