EP2110324 - Blocking unit for a supply and sorting device for packaging machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UHLMANN PAC-SYSTEME GmbH & Co. KG Uhlmannstrasse 14-18 88471 Laupheim / DE | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hess, Christian Im Täle 5 88487 Mietingen / DE | 02 /
Gnann, Kurt Wielandstrasse 9/2 88400 Biberach / DE | 03 /
Zuleger, Martin Schlossäcker 18 88480 Achstetten / DE | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | Wächter, Jochen, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Wächter, Jochen, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/43] | Wächter, Jochen, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08007416.4 | 16.04.2008 | [2009/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2110324 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110324 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65B35/06, // B65B5/10 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
B65B35/06 (EP,US);
B65B5/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, SE [2010/26] |
Former [2009/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Absperreinheit einer Zuführ- und Sortiervorrichtung für Verpackungsmaschinen | [2009/43] | English: | Blocking unit for a supply and sorting device for packaging machines | [2009/43] | French: | Unité de verrouillage d'un dispositif d'alimentation et de tri pour machines d'emballage | [2009/43] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 09.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 07.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 22.12.2010 | FR | 02.05.2011 | [2012/12] |
Former [2011/34] | SE | 22.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1391386 (AYLWARD ENTPR INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 25 * * figures 1,7 *; | [A]EP0224017 (UHLMANN MASCHF JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4685271 (RINGER DONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * |