EP2110415 - Anorganic nanoparticles and polymer composites created with same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanoresins AG Charlottenburger Strasse 9 21502 Geesthacht / DE | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langerbeins, Klaus, Dr. Twiete 7 21502 Geesthacht / DE | 02 /
Kühner, Uwe Dietrich, Dr. Am Kaiserkai 17 20457 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Siol, Werner, Dr. Goerdelerweg 17 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08007582.3 | 18.04.2008 | [2009/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2110415 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09C3/08, C09C3/12, C08K9/04, C08K9/06 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
C08K9/04 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C08K9/06 (EP,US);
C09C1/3063 (EP,US);
C09C1/3081 (EP,US);
C09C3/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/26] |
Former [2009/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anorganische Nanopartikel und damit hergestellte Polymerkomposite | [2009/43] | English: | Anorganic nanoparticles and polymer composites created with same | [2009/43] | French: | Nanoparticule anorganique et composite polymère ainsi fabriqué | [2009/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/41] | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE10100633 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [DX] 1-15 * page 5, line 8 * * page 8; tables 1,2 * | by applicant | DE69826226T | DE10100633 | DE10259460 | DE3632215 | US2801185 | - PEYRELASSE ET AL., LANGMUIR, (2006), vol. 22, page 6683 | - MAUGER ET AL., POLYM INT, (2004), vol. 53, page 378 | - T.G. FOX, Bull., AM. PHYS. SOC., (1956), vol. 1, page 123 | DE19991025331 |