EP1985253 - Cooled helical antenna for microwave ablation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2013/37] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states Vivant Medical, Inc. 5920 Longbow Drive Boulder, CO 80301 / US | ||
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rossetto, Francesca 1931 Creekside Drive Longmont, CO 80504 / US | 02 /
Prakash, Mani N. 1265 Edinboro Drive Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 03 /
Massangcay, Jolie 669 West Conejo Avenue Mountain House, CA 95391 / US | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08007924.7 | 24.04.2008 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | US20070789521 | 25.04.2007 Original published format: US 789521 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1985253 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1985253 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1985253 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2011/35] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gekühlte Wendelantenne zur Mikrowellenablation | [2008/44] | English: | Cooled helical antenna for microwave ablation | [2008/44] | French: | Antenne hélicoïdale refroidie pour ablation à micro-ondes | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 22.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.08.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.04.2014 | IT | 02.04.2014 | [2019/40] |
Former [2015/18] | ES | 02.04.2014 | |
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 02.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO0047283 (KAI TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * page 14, line 6 - page 15, line 27 * * page 17, line 16 - page 18, line 30 * * figure 8 * [Y] 5,7-9,11-14,17 [I] 15; | [XY]WO9741800 (UROLOGIX INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 9 - page 6, line 17 * * claim 20 * [Y] 5,11-14; | [YA]WO03024309 (UROLOGIX INC [US]) [Y] 2-6,11-14,16-19 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 29 * * figures 2A, 2B, 7A, 7B * [A] 1,15; | [Y]US2005015081 (TUROVSKIY ROMAN [US], et al) [Y] 7-9 * paragraph [0104]; figure 26A *; | [Y]US5603697 (GRUNDY DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,6,16-19 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 44 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP1723922 (VIVANT MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 16 * paragraphs [0025] - [0031]; figures 3A, 3B * |