27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
28.10.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
07.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
12.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] |
29.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
22.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] |
24.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
19.11.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] |
19.11.2010 |
Change - priority |
published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] |
02.11.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.11.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.06.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.02.2010 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.11.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.06.2009 |
First examination report |
|
24.06.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.06.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
21.02.2009 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.10.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
10.10.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
27.05.2008 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|