Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004051224 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2005 | A3 | WO2004051224 | 17.06.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US30980302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004015080 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2006 | A3 | WO2004015080 | 19.02.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US21564402 | 09.08.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004007755 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2004 | A3 | WO2004007755 | 06.05.2004 | A9 | WO2004007755 | 22.01.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US39623702 | 15.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004001062 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2004 | A3 | WO2004001062 | 31.12.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03048732 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2003 | A3 | WO03048732 | 12.06.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03006677 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2004 | A3 | WO03006677 | 23.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02101358 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2003 | A3 | WO02101358 | 27.03.2003 | A9 | WO02101358 | 19.12.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9850536 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2017 | B2 | US2015203913 | 23.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US79075710 | 28.05.2010 | US19495802 | 12.07.2002 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US50702209 | 21.07.2009 | US23414300 | 21.09.2000 | US201414540832 | 13.11.2014 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US201213604872 | 06.09.2012 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8906626 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2014 | B2 | US2013244882 | 19.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US79075710 | 28.05.2010 | US19495802 | 12.07.2002 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US50702209 | 21.07.2009 | US23414300 | 21.09.2000 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US201213604872 | 06.09.2012 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8288103 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2012 | B2 | US2010311064 | 09.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US79075710 | 28.05.2010 | US19495802 | 12.07.2002 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US50702209 | 21.07.2009 | US23414300 | 21.09.2000 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010015626 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US19495802 | 12.07.2002 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US50702209 | 21.07.2009 | US23414300 | 21.09.2000 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8003354 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2011 | B2 | US2008242555 | 02.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23414300 | 21.09.2000 | US3258108 | 15.02.2008 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8076063 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2011 | B2 | US2007269801 | 22.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US0338582 | 03.12.2003 | US53720403 | 03.12.2003 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US30980302 | 03.12.2002 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23414300 | 21.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005214825 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US39623702 | 15.07.2002 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | US3688605 | 14.01.2005 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US0104056 | 07.02.2001 | US62085203 | 15.07.2003 | US19495802 | 12.07.2002 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23414300 | 21.09.2000 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004224353 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US86493704 | 09.06.2004 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004224352 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | US86493504 | 09.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004121364 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US39623702 | 15.07.2002 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US0104056 | 07.02.2001 | US62085203 | 15.07.2003 | US19495802 | 12.07.2002 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23414300 | 21.09.2000 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10837059 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2020 | B2 | US2018094316 | 05.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US201715827141 | 30.11.2017 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US79075710 | 28.05.2010 | US19495802 | 12.07.2002 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US50702209 | 21.07.2009 | US23414300 | 21.09.2000 | US201414540832 | 13.11.2014 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US201213604872 | 06.09.2012 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003521252 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0104056 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2246438 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2019 | B1 | EP2246438 | 03.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | EP02763268 | 12.07.2002 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US0222168 | 12.07.2002 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1860200 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | EP02795731 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1481076 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2005 | A4 | EP1481076 | 01.12.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US0222168 | 12.07.2002 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1461458 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2005 | A4 | EP1461458 | 29.09.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US0238672 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1395805 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2005 | A4 | EP1395805 | 10.03.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US0218634 | 11.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1259643 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2008 | B1 | EP1259643 | 27.11.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0104056 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1255865 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2007 | B1 | EP1255865 | 13.11.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0104055 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473100 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3806801 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0104056 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3806701 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0104055 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473100 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003297654 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2004 | A8 | AU2003297654 | 23.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338582 | 03.12.2003 | US30980302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003272203 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2004 | A8 | AU2003272203 | 06.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0319680 | 20.06.2003 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003269908 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2004 | A8 | AU2003269908 | 02.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39623702 | 15.07.2002 | US0322171 | 15.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003259709 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2004 | A8 | AU2003259709 | 25.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21564402 | 09.08.2002 | US0324963 | 07.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002360474 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US0238672 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002327236 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US0222168 | 12.07.2002 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2001238067B | Global Dossier | 25.01.2007 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US0104055 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473100 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1990428 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2010 | B1 | EP1990428 | 12.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01910466 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2399733 | 20.09.2011 | C | CA2399733 | 09.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0104056 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2401962 | 09.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0104055 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473100 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2450139 | 19.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US0218634 | 11.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2453527 | 23.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US0222168 | 12.07.2002 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2467814 | 12.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US0238672 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2494720 | 19.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21564402 | 09.08.2002 | US0324963 | 07.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60127939T | 24.01.2008 | T2 | DE60127939D1 | 31.05.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0104055 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473100 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60136166D1 | 27.11.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0104056 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1259643T | 23.02.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US0104056 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1047603 | 27.03.2009 | B | HK1047603 | 28.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0104056 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002006617 | 17.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6890741 | 10.05.2005 | B2 | US2002132241 | 19.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23414300 | 21.09.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6812005 | 02.11.2004 | B2 | US2002172946 | 21.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77920201 | 07.02.2001 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473100 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003003490 | 02.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US15555002 | 24.05.2002 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6913884 | 05.07.2005 | B2 | US2003036064 | 20.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7361488 | 22.04.2008 | B2 | US2003104434 | 05.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77920201 | 07.02.2001 | US0104055 | 07.02.2001 | US21564402 | 09.08.2002 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473100 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7582420 | 01.09.2009 | B2 | US2003108900 | 12.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US19495802 | 12.07.2002 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7611869 | 03.11.2009 | B2 | US2003170684 | 11.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US0338582 | 03.12.2003 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US30980302 | 03.12.2002 | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23414300 | 21.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7955794 | 07.06.2011 | B2 | US2003211489 | 13.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77937601 | 07.02.2001 | US31127101 | 09.08.2001 | US33695801 | 03.12.2001 | US29760901 | 11.06.2001 | US91523101 | 24.07.2001 | US34182701 | 17.12.2001 | US17772702 | 20.06.2002 | US23414300 | 21.09.2000 | US30511801 | 12.07.2001 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | US93128501 | 16.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0157269 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2002 | A3 | WO0157269 | 09.08.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0157268 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2002 | A3 | WO0157268 | 09.08.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473100 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE360095T | 15.05.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473100 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE411397T | 15.10.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE492652T | 15.01.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60143723D1 | 03.02.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US18081000 | 07.02.2000 | US23473200 | 22.09.2000 | Type | Earlier application | EP1259643 |