EP2020785 - Method and system for bidirectional radio communication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ista International GmbH Luxemburger Straße 1 45131 Essen / DE | [2018/29] |
Former [2009/06] | For all designated states Ista International GmbH Grugaplatz 2 45131 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bley, Bert, Dipl.-Ing. Brassertstraße 1 45130 Essen / DE | 02 /
Niederfeld, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Wusthoffstrasse 6 45131 Essen / DE | [2018/44] |
Former [2009/06] | 01 /
Bley, Bert, Dripl.-Ing. Brasserstraße 1 45130 Essen / DE | ||
02 /
Niederfeld, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Wusthoffstrasse 6 45131 Essen / DE | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wißgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/44] |
Former [2009/06] | COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & SOZIEN Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08008221.7 | 30.04.2008 | [2009/06] | Priority number, date | DE20071036751 | 03.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007036751 | [2009/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2020785 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2020785 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2020785 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/04, // H04W72/08, H04W84/18 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
H04W74/04 (EP);
H04W72/54 (EP);
H04W84/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/06] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2016/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [2009/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur bidirektionalen Funkkommunikation | [2009/06] | English: | Method and system for bidirectional radio communication | [2009/06] | French: | Procédé et système de communication radio bidirectionnelle | [2009/06] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2008 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2008 | CY | 31.10.2018 | CZ | 31.10.2018 | EE | 31.10.2018 | ES | 31.10.2018 | FI | 31.10.2018 | HR | 31.10.2018 | IT | 31.10.2018 | LT | 31.10.2018 | LV | 31.10.2018 | MC | 31.10.2018 | MT | 31.10.2018 | RO | 31.10.2018 | SE | 31.10.2018 | SI | 31.10.2018 | SK | 31.10.2018 | TR | 31.10.2018 | BG | 31.01.2019 | NO | 31.01.2019 | GR | 01.02.2019 | IS | 28.02.2019 | PT | 01.03.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | GB | 30.04.2019 | IE | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | LU | 30.04.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.04.2008 | |
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | CZ | 31.10.2018 | |
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 31.10.2018 | |
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 31.10.2018 | |
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | CZ | 31.10.2018 | |
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | CZ | 31.10.2018 | |
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | CZ | 31.10.2018 | |
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CZ | 31.10.2018 | |
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 31.10.2018 | |
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | ES | 31.10.2018 | |
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | ES | 31.10.2018 | |
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 31.10.2018 | |
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 31.10.2018 | |
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 31.10.2018 | |
NO | 31.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0911775 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO0021053 (SLC TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 3, line 15 - line 24 * * page 5, line 1 - line 22 * * page 10, line 21 - line 29 * * page 18, line 22 - page 21, line 12 * * page 25, line 26 - page 32, line 11 * * page 38, line 15 - page 40, line 25 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1282094 (SIEMENS GEBAEUDESICHERHEIT GMB [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0005] , [0009] , [0010] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] ** figure 6 *; | [A]EP1392078 (ZIEGLER HORST [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraphs [0028] , [0038] , [0039] , [0046] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraphs [0075] , [0076] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0107] *; | [Y]US2007066311 (REIBEL JEAN-MICHEL [FR], et al) [Y] 1-16 * figures 2,3 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0010] * * paragraphs [0029] , [0033] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0071] *; | [A]US2007076650 (MANJESHWAR ARATI [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraphs [0118] , [0119] * * paragraphs [0160] , [0161] * |