EP2113332 - Method of and laser device for working and/or joining of workpieces with poweracting and pilot lasers and at least one diffractive optical element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leister Process Technologies Galileostrasse 10 6056 Kägiswil / CH | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheidt, Michael Preyenstrasse 5 8623 Wetzikon / CH | 02 /
Gubler, Ulrich Abendweg 4 6006 Luzern / CH | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | Klocke, Peter ABACUS Patentanwälte Lise-Meitner-Strasse 21 72202 Nagold / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Klocke, Peter ABACUS Patentanwälte Klocke Späth Barth European Patent and Trademark Attorneys Kappelstrasse 8 72160 Horb / DE | Application number, filing date | 08008336.3 | 02.05.2008 | [2009/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113332 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2113332 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/06 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
B23K26/0604 (EP,US);
B23K26/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Laservorrichtung zum Bearbeiten und/oder Verbinden von Werkstücken mittels Laserstrahlung mit Leistungswirk- und Pilotlaser und mindestens einem diffraktiven optischen Element | [2009/45] | English: | Method of and laser device for working and/or joining of workpieces with poweracting and pilot lasers and at least one diffractive optical element | [2009/45] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'usinage et/ou assemblage de pièces avec des lasers de puissance et pilote et au moins un élément optique diffractant | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 07.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | HR | 18.08.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | IE | 18.08.2010 | LT | 18.08.2010 | LV | 18.08.2010 | MT | 18.08.2010 | NL | 18.08.2010 | PL | 18.08.2010 | PT | 18.08.2010 | RO | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | BG | 18.11.2010 | NO | 18.11.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | ES | 29.11.2010 | IS | 18.12.2010 | LU | 02.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PT | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
LU | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/32] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PT | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
LU | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
LU | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/27] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4102572 (O MEARA THOMAS R) [A] 1,6,7,13,15 * column 4, lines 3-18; figure 1 *; | [YD]DE19836115 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [YD] 1,6,7,13,15 * abstract *; | [A]DE19959862 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 2-5,9-12* abstract *; | [YA]US2002021723 (AMAKO JUN [JP], et al) [Y] 1,6,7,13,15 * paragraphs [0040] , [0041]; figure 1 * [A] 8,14; | [A]US2005098548 (KOBAYASHI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 2-5,9-12 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19836115 | DE19825092 | US2002021723 | DE102004017129 | US2005098548 |