EP1992902 - IR deception system for defending against missiles with IR sensitive seekers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2014/35] |
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamilton, Colin Salbeiweg 2 89134 Blaustein / DE | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Meel, Thomas Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Patentabteilung 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Meel, Thomas EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung DSLAIP1 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2008/47] | Meel, Thomas Patentassessor EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung, DSLA IP1 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08008350.4 | 02.05.2008 | [2008/47] | Priority number, date | DE20071022820 | 15.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007022820 | [2008/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1992902 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1992902 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1992902 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F41G7/22, // G01S7/495 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
F41G7/224 (EP,US);
G01S7/495 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2009/31] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | IR-Täuschsystem zur Abwehr von Flugkörpern mit IR-empfindlichen Suchköpfen | [2008/48] | English: | IR deception system for defending against missiles with IR sensitive seekers | [2008/47] | French: | Système de leurrage IR pour une défense anti aérienne contrant les missiles équippés de têtes chercheuses sensibles aux IR | [2008/48] |
Former [2008/47] | IR-Täuschsystem zur Abwehr von Flugkörpern mit IR-empfindlichen-Suchköpfen | ||
Former [2008/47] | Système d'échange par IR destiné à repousser des corps volants à l'aide de têtes chercheuses sensibles aux IR | Examination procedure | 15.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 27.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 24.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - ANONYMOUS, "Directional Infrared Counter Measures", WIKIPEDIA, THE FREE ENCYCLOPEDIA, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/DIRCM, XP002498701 [X] 1,11 [A] 2-10 | [XA] - ANONYMOUS, "AN/AAQ-24 Directional Infrared Countermeasures (DIRCM)", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20050427), URL: http://www.globalsecurity.org/military/systems/aircraft/systems/an-aaq-24.htm, XP002498702 [X] 1,11 [A] 2-10 | [XA] - ANONYMOUS, "AN/AAQ-24(V) NEMESIS Directional Infrared Countermeasure (DIRCM)", NORTHROP GRUMMAN PRODUCT & SOLUTIONS BROCHURE, URL: http://www.es.northropgrumman.com/solutions/nemesis/assets/AAQ24.pdf, XP002498703 [X] 1,11 [A] 2-10 | Examination | EP1298408 |