EP1987719 - Sausage skin brake with adjustable brake power [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Opposition rejected | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poly-clip System GmbH & Co. KG Niedeckerstraße 1 65795 Hattersheim / DE | [2012/41] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states Poly-clip System GmbH & Co. KG Westerbachstrasse 45 60489 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanten, Jürgen Am Ölberg 9 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | 02 /
Zurwieden, Martin von Galenstrasse 11 48336 Sassenberg / DE | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2015/15] |
Former [2008/45] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08008449.4 | 05.05.2008 | [2008/45] | Priority number, date | DE20071020805 | 03.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007020805 | [2008/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1987719 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1987719 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A22C11/02 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
A22C11/0263 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, IT, LI [2009/28] |
Former [2008/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Darmbremse mit einstellbarer Bremskraft | [2008/45] | English: | Sausage skin brake with adjustable brake power | [2008/45] | French: | Frein de boyau doté d'une force de freinage réglable | [2008/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 07.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.10.2015
28.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Tipper Tie technopack GmbH Wilhelm-Bergner-Straße 9a 21509 Glinde / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll, et al, et al Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.10.2015
28.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Tipper Tie technopack GmbH Wilhelm-Bergner-Straße 9a 21509 Glinde / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll, et al, et al Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2015/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.10.2015
28.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Tipper Tie technopack GmbH Wilhelm-Bergner-Straße 9a 21509 Glinde / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll, et al, et al Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | 16.02.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.08.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2017 | 09.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.01.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.02.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.04.2015 | IT | 08.04.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | [2016/08] |
Former [2016/06] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 08.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0126474 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 28 - page 6, line 20 * * page 11, line 9 - page 14, line 32 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2109219 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [X] 1,2,7-15 * page 2, lines 33-38 * * page 4, lines 5-116 * * figures 1-7 *; | [AD]DE102005044879 (POLY CLIP SYSTEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5916019 (WHITTLESEY THOMAS [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1763999 (POLY CLIP SYSTEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4970758 (NAPLES DANIEL F [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE102005044879 | EP0126474 |