EP1992671 - Thermosetting encapsulation adhesive sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyoda, Eiji c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
Noro, Hiroshi c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 08008531.9 | 06.05.2008 | [2008/47] | Priority number, date | JP20070131994 | 17.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007131994 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1992671 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1992671 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09J163/00, C09J7/02 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
C09J163/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L33/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09J11/04 (KR);
C09J11/06 (KR);
C09J7/30 (KR);
C08L2666/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2203/326 (KR);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2924/00011 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2852 (EP,US);
Y10T428/287 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09J163/00, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00011, H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/0401 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Title | German: | Wärmehärtende Klebefolie für Verkapselung | [2008/47] | English: | Thermosetting encapsulation adhesive sheet | [2008/47] | French: | Feuille adhésive à encapsulation thermodurcissable | [2008/47] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 07.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.11.2009 | BE | 18.11.2009 | CY | 18.11.2009 | CZ | 18.11.2009 | DK | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | FI | 18.11.2009 | HR | 18.11.2009 | IT | 18.11.2009 | LT | 18.11.2009 | LV | 18.11.2009 | MT | 18.11.2009 | NL | 18.11.2009 | PL | 18.11.2009 | RO | 18.11.2009 | SE | 18.11.2009 | SI | 18.11.2009 | SK | 18.11.2009 | TR | 18.11.2009 | BG | 18.02.2010 | NO | 18.02.2010 | GR | 19.02.2010 | ES | 28.02.2010 | IS | 18.03.2010 | PT | 18.04.2010 | IE | 06.05.2010 | LU | 06.05.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | FR | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.04.2010 | ||
IE | 06.05.2010 | ||
LU | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.04.2010 | ||
IE | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.04.2010 | ||
IE | 06.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 06.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 28.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1447421 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * claims 1-3 *; | [AD]US2004251777 (YAMAMOTO KOJI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-4 * page 5, paragraph 66 * * page 3, paragraph 49 *; | [A]US2006234043 (NAKANISHI TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* claims 1,2,8 * | by applicant | JP2004056296 | JP2004064732 | JP2005039331 |