EP2025252 - Item of clothing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fleck, Jürgen Lotzenäcker 18 72379 Hechingen / DE | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08008656.4 | 08.05.2008 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | DE20071037968 | 11.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007037968 | [2009/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2025252 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2025252 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A41D1/00, A41D15/00 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
A41D1/04 (EP);
A41D15/00 (EP);
G09F17/00 (EP);
G09F21/02 (EP);
G09F21/023 (EP);
G09F7/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/18] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bekleidungsstück | [2009/08] | English: | Item of clothing | [2009/08] | French: | Pièce de vêtement | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/23] | 17.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4296498 (VINSON JOSEPH J) [X] 1,2,5-8 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 11 *; | [XI]US1113977 (FREEDMAN WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 3,4; | [X]US4078265 (CONDIT TERESA HELENA) [X] 1,5-7 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 68 *; | [X]DE20012817U (HAY MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1,5,7,8 * claims 1-3,5 *; | [X]US5671480 (KROUT KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 * |