EP1962519 - Fibre optic module and system including rear connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADC Telecommunications, Inc. 13625 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344-2252 / US | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmel, Steven C. 5516 12th Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55417 / US | 02 /
Nhep, Ponharith 9013 West 137th Street Savage, MN 55378 / US | 03 /
Smith, Trevor D. 17860 Liv Lane Eden Prairie, MN 55346 / US | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08008856.0 | 02.11.2005 | [2008/35] | Priority number, date | US20040980978 | 03.11.2004 Original published format: US 980978 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1962519 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1962519 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/14 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
G02B6/44526 (EP);
H04Q1/14 (KR);
G02B6/4442 (US);
G02B6/00 (US);
G02B6/36 (US);
G02B6/3897 (US);
G02B6/444 (US);
G02B6/4452 (US);
G02B6/44528 (EP);
G02B6/4454 (US);
G02B6/4471 (US);
G02B6/46 (US);
H04B10/00 (KR);
H04B10/25 (KR);
G02B23/2476 (US);
G02B6/3879 (EP,US);
G02B6/4453 (EP,US);
H04Q2201/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Title | German: | Glasfasermodul und System mit rückwärtigen Steckverbindern | [2008/35] | English: | Fibre optic module and system including rear connectors | [2008/35] | French: | Module de fibre optique et système comportant des connecteurs arrières | [2008/35] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05826135.5 / EP1808028 | Divisional application(s) | EP10174170.0 / EP2249581 | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2010 | BE | 29.09.2010 | CY | 29.09.2010 | CZ | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | FI | 29.09.2010 | LT | 29.09.2010 | LV | 29.09.2010 | RO | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | IE | 02.11.2010 | LU | 02.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | IS | 29.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 02.11.2010 | ||
LU | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 02.11.2010 | ||
LU | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/28] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5363465 (KORKOWSKI JEFF L [US], et al); | [A]WO0075706 (ADC TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) | by applicant | US5363465 | US2005053341 |