17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
20.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
13.12.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
14.06.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
19.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
08.03.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
22.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
01.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
25.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
06.07.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
04.07.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.07.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.04.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
15.05.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] |
13.05.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.11.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |