Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5363033B | Global Dossier | 11.12.2013 | B2 | JP2008309151 | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102007027711 | 15.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2003342 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2018 | B1 | EP2003342 | 12.07.2017 | A3 | EP2003342 | 17.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102007027711 | 15.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102007027711 | 18.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007027711 | 15.06.2007 |