EP2003342 - Method for operating an assembly with vacuum pump and assembly with a vacuum pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH Berliner Strasse 43 35614 Asslar / DE | [2018/47] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH Berliner Strasse 43 35614 Asslar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernhardt, Helmut Am Rabenbaum 33A 35584 Wetzlar / DE | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/47] | Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08009333.9 | 21.05.2008 | [2008/51] | Priority number, date | DE20071027711 | 15.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007027711 | [2008/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2003342 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2003342 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2003342 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16C32/04, F04D19/04, F04D27/02, F04D29/058 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
F04D19/048 (EP);
F04D27/0292 (EP);
F04D29/058 (EP);
F16C32/0444 (EP);
F16C32/0489 (EP);
F16C2360/45 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/51] | F04D19/04, F04D27/02, F04D29/058, F16C39/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2018/12] | |||
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Anordnung mit Vakuumpumpe und Anordnung mit einer Vakuumpumpe | [2008/51] | English: | Method for operating an assembly with vacuum pump and assembly with a vacuum pump | [2008/51] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement d'un agencement doté d'une pompe à vide et agencement doté d'une pompe à vide | [2008/51] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 18.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 20.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 18.04.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 18.04.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 18.04.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 18.04.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 18.04.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 18.04.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2008 | CY | 21.11.2018 | DK | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | ES | 21.11.2018 | FI | 21.11.2018 | HR | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | MT | 21.11.2018 | NL | 21.11.2018 | PL | 21.11.2018 | RO | 21.11.2018 | SE | 21.11.2018 | SI | 21.11.2018 | SK | 21.11.2018 | TR | 21.11.2018 | BG | 21.02.2019 | NO | 21.02.2019 | GR | 22.02.2019 | IS | 21.03.2019 | PT | 21.03.2019 | AT | 21.05.2019 | IE | 21.05.2019 | LU | 21.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | FR | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.05.2008 | |
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
AT | 21.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 21.11.2018 | |
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
AT | 21.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | DK | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
AT | 21.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | DK | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | DK | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | DK | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | DK | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | DK | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | DK | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | DK | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | DK | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | DK | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | DK | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | DK | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | ES | 21.11.2018 | |
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 21.11.2018 | |
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 21.11.2018 | |
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | |
NO | 21.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08338393 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [X] 1,7-9 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0018]; figure - *; | [A]JP2003156100 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [XI]US2003161733 (KABASAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,7 * paragraphs [0010] - [0020] - [ 105] - [0121]; figure - * [I] 2,4-6,10-12; | [A]JP2005036839 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3239328 | EP1118774 | EP1711711 |