EP2014602 - Method and device for mounting wood discs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Märzinger, Alfred Föhrenweg 13 4203 Altenberg / AT | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/03] | Application number, filing date | 08009341.2 | 21.05.2008 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | AT20070000805 | 23.05.2007 Original published format: AT 8052007 | AT20070000806 | 23.05.2007 Original published format: AT 8062007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014602 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/58 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
B66C1/585 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für das maschinelle Fassen von Holzscheiten | [2009/03] | English: | Method and device for mounting wood discs | [2009/03] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la saisie mécanique de bûches de bois | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/24] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE1531205 (HOLM DR ING OTTO) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 4; figures 1-3 * [Y] 7; | [X]US3082031 (LINDBERG ROBERT H) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 70; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]CA2313584 (SCP 89 INC [CA]) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [A]US4740023 (MILLER ROBERT [US]) [A] 4 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4444538 | US4688544 | DE3537841 | DE1481870 | DE4330498 |