EP1955646 - Endoscope fluid control input device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arai, Keiichi, c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Yuichi, c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 03 /
Miyagi, Takayasu, c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 04 /
Maeda, Toshinari, c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2008/42] |
Former [2008/33] | 01 /
Arai, Keiichi, c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
Ikeda, Yuichi, c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
Miyagi, Takayasu, c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
Maeda, Toshinari, c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08009381.8 | 30.04.2004 | [2008/33] | Priority number, date | JP20030133705 | 12.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003133705 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955646 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1955646 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/015 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
A61B1/00068 (EP,US);
A61B1/015 (EP,US);
H01H13/50 (EP,US);
H01H2215/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Endoskopfluidkontrolle | [2009/32] | English: | Endoscope fluid control input device | [2008/33] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de fluide pour endoscope | [2009/32] |
Former [2008/33] | Eingangsvorrichtung zur Endoskopfluidkontrolle | ||
Former [2008/33] | Dispositif d'entrée de contrôle de fluide d'endoscope | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 17.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04730704.6 / EP1623662 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.2010 | BE | 24.02.2010 | CY | 24.02.2010 | CZ | 24.02.2010 | DK | 24.02.2010 | EE | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | IT | 24.02.2010 | NL | 24.02.2010 | PL | 24.02.2010 | RO | 24.02.2010 | SE | 24.02.2010 | SI | 24.02.2010 | SK | 24.02.2010 | TR | 24.02.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | IE | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | LU | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | BG | 24.05.2010 | GR | 25.05.2010 | ES | 04.06.2010 | PT | 25.06.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
LU | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9802894 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [A] 1-6* page 1 - page 5 *; | [A]US5872527 (YANAGISAWA SATOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5938589 (WAKO FUMIHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 3 - column 8 *; | [A]GB2335080 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 25 - page 4, line 9 *; | [A]US6303887 (ANDO HITOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 27 * | by applicant | JP2000189380 |