EP1995289 - Heat-curable fluoropolyether adhesive composition and bonding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koshikawa, Hidenori Silicone-Electronics Mat. Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co.,Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Shiono, Mikio Silicone-Electronics Mat. Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co.,Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Hara, Hiroyasu Silicone-Electronics Mat. Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co.,Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 04 /
Aketa, Takashi Silicone-Electronics Mat. Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co.,Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
Koshikawa, Hidenori Silicone-electronics materials Shin-Etsu chemical co.,ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Shiono, Mikio Silicone-electronics materials Shin-Etsu chemical co.,ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Hara, Hiroyasu Silicone-electronics materials Shin-Etsu chemical co.,ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Aketa, Takashi Silicone-electronics materials Shin-Etsu chemical co.,ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Merkle, Gebhard Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Merkle, Gebhard TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/48] | Merkle, Gebhard TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08009520.1 | 23.05.2008 | [2008/48] | Priority number, date | JP20070139131 | 25.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007139131 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1995289 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1995289 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09J171/02, // C08K5/11, C08K5/12, C08L83/06, C08L83/08 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
C08G65/007 (EP,US);
C08L83/00 (EP,US);
C09J171/02 (EP,US);
C08G2650/48 (EP,US);
C08K5/0025 (EP,US);
C08L2666/34 (EP,US);
C08L83/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09J171/02, C08L2666/34 (US,EP);
C09J171/02, C08L83/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/31] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wärmehärtbare Fluorpolyetherhaftzusammensetzung und Klebeverfahren | [2008/48] | English: | Heat-curable fluoropolyether adhesive composition and bonding method | [2008/48] | French: | Composition adhésive en fluoropolyéther thermodurcissable et procédé de liaison | [2008/48] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0765916 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [YD] 1-8 * page 17, lines 49,50; example -; claim - *; | [Y]EP1172414 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0039] - [0052] - [0063]; example 6 * * comparative example 3 * * claim -; tables 1,2 *; | [Y]US5312855 (OKAMI TAKEHIDE [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * column 4, line 25 - column 6, line 26; claim . * | Examination | EP1486534 | by applicant | JP2990646B | JPH08199070 | JP3239717B | JPH0995615 |