EP2005914 - Hand-actuated articulating surgical tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CareFusion 2200, Inc. 3750 Torrey View Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2010/17] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Allegiance Corporation 1430 Waukegan Road McGaw Park Illinois 60085-6787 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doyle, Mark Christopher 4804 50th Street San Diego, CA 92115 / US | 02 /
Caputo, Jimmy 2157 Vista La Nisa Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Gahlert, Stefan, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Gahlert, Stefan, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08009553.2 | 18.07.2001 | [2008/52] | Priority number, date | US20000219593P | 20.07.2000 Original published format: US 219593 P | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2005914 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2005914 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2005914 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
A61B34/70 (EP,US);
A61B17/00 (KR);
A61B34/35 (EP,US);
A61B34/37 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00539 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2829 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2908 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2931 (EP);
A61B2017/2932 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2944 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | Handbetriebenes chirurgisches Gelenkinstrument | [2008/52] | English: | Hand-actuated articulating surgical tool | [2008/52] | French: | Outil chirurgical articulé actionné à la main | [2008/52] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 05.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01959039.7 / EP1309277 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010959039) is 12.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.06.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2012 | BE | 04.04.2012 | CY | 04.04.2012 | DK | 04.04.2012 | FI | 04.04.2012 | SE | 04.04.2012 | TR | 04.04.2012 | GR | 05.07.2012 | GB | 18.07.2012 | IE | 18.07.2012 | IT | 18.07.2012 | LU | 18.07.2012 | ES | 19.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | FR | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | PT | 06.08.2012 | [2016/43] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LU | 18.07.2012 | ||
ES | 19.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
ES | 19.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
ES | 19.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 04.04.2012 | |
SE | 04.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3266494 (BROWNRIGG GERALD K A, et al) [A] * figure - *; | [X]US5361583 (HUITEMA THOMAS W [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-13 * abstract * * column 2, lines 10-28 * * column 2, lines 40-47 * * column 3, lines 36-47 * * column 4, line 53 - column 6, line 58 * * column 8, line 23 - column 9, line 62 * * column 10, lines 15-56 *; | [A]WO9636814 (STROMSHOLMENS MEK VERKSTAD [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [Y]US5791231 (COHN MICHAEL B [US], et al) [Y] 5,8 * abstract * * column 3, lines 31-56 * * column 4, lines 22-30 * * column 5, lines 51-61 * * column 7, lines 7-29 * * column 8, lines 10-62 *; | [Y]US5833656 (SMITH KEVIN W [US], et al) [Y] 5,8 * abstract * * column 3, lines 56-58 * * column 8, lines 36-57 * * column 19, lines 36-55 * | by applicant | US5361583 |