EP2128158 - Heterocyclic cyclopropyl-substituted FXR binding compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phenex Pharmaceuticals AG J542N, Werksgelände BASF 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abel, Ulrich Spitzwegstrasse 4 69126 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Kremoser, Claus Gugenmusweg 20 69121 Heidelberg / DE | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08009576.3 | 26.05.2008 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128158 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/12, A61K31/4439, A61P1/16, A61P3/10, A61P7/02, A61P9/10 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/32] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Heterocyclische Cyclopropyl-substituierte FXR-bindende Verbindungen | [2009/49] | English: | Heterocyclic cyclopropyl-substituted FXR binding compounds | [2009/49] | French: | Composés de liaison FXR substitués de cyclopropyle hétérocyclique | [2009/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO2007140174 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [DX] 1-23 * claims 1,16-23 * * compounds 5,46,65,67,69,72,93 *; | [DA]WO2008025540 (PHENEX PHARMACEUTICALS AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-23 * claims 1,14-38 * * compound 28 * | by applicant | WO2008051942 | WO2008025539 | WO2008025540 | WO2007140183 | WO2007092751 | WO2007140174 | WO2004048349 | WO03015771 | WO0037077 | WO2004087076 | WO03080803 | - D. MANGELSDORF ET AL., "The nuclear receptor superfamily: the second decade", CELL, (1995), vol. 83, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(95)90199-X, pages 835 - 839, XP000929729 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(95)90199-X | - R EVANS, "The nuclear receptor superfamily: a rosetta stone for physiology", MOL. ENDOCRINOL, (2005), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 1429 - 1438 | - M. SCHENA, "Mammalian glucocorticoid receptor derivatives enhance transcription in yeast", SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, no. 4868, pages 965 - 967 | - A. BRZOZOWSKI ET AL., "Molecular basis of agonism and antagonism in the oestrogen receptor", NATURE, (1997), vol. 389, no. 6652, doi:doi:10.1038/39645, pages 753 - 758, XP002248702 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/39645 | - D. HEERY ET AL., "A signature motif in transcriptional co-activators mediates binding to nuclear receptors", NATURE, (1997), vol. 387, no. 6634, doi:doi:10.1038/42750, pages 733 - 6, XP002162222 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/42750 | - T. HEINZEL ET AL., "A complex containing N-CoR, mSin3 and histone deacetylase mediates transcriptional repression", NATURE, (1997), vol. 387, no. 6628, pages 16 - 17 | - K. NETTLES; G. GREENE, "Ligand control of coregulator recruitment to nuclear receptors", ANNU. REV. PHYSIOL, (2005), vol. 67, pages 309 - 33 | - A. ARANDA, "A. Pascual "Nuclear hormone receptors and gene expression", PHYSIOL. REV, (2001), vol. 81, no. 3, pages 1269 - 1304 | - B. FORMAN ET AL., "Identification of a nuclear receptor that is activated by farnesol metabolites", CELL, (1995), vol. 81, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(95)90530-8, pages 687 - 693, XP000919168 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(95)90530-8 | - D. PARKS ET AL., "Bile acids: natural ligands for an orphan nuclear receptor", SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 284, no. 5418, doi:doi:10.1126/science.284.5418.1365, pages 1365 - 1368, XP002927559 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.284.5418.1365 | - M. MAKISHIMA ET AL., "Identification of a nuclear receptor for bile acids", SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 284, no. 5418, doi:doi:10.1126/science.284.5418.1362, pages 1362 - 1365, XP002927558 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.284.5418.1362 | - J. HOLT ET AL., "Definition of a novel growth factor-dependent signal cascade for the suppression of bile acid biosynthesis", GENES DEV., (2003), vol. 17, no. 13, pages 1581 - 91 | - T. INAGAKI ET AL., "Fibroblast growth factor 15 functions as an enterohepatic signal to regulate bile acid homeostasis", CELL METAB, (2005), vol. 2, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cmet.2005.09.001, pages 217 - 225, XP055000838 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cmet.2005.09.001 | - P. ANANDET, "Downregulation of TACO gene transcription restricts mycobacterial entry/survival within human macrophages", FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (2005), vol. 250, no. 1, pages 137 - 144 | - R. C. BUIJSMAN ET AL., "Non-Steroidal Steroid Receptor Modulators", CURR. MED. CHEM, (2005), vol. 12, pages 1017 - 1075 | - R. PRENTIS ET AL., "Pharmaceutical innovation by seven UK-owned pharmaceutical companies (1964-1985", BR. J. CLIN. PHARMACOL, (1988), vol. 25, pages 387 - 396, XP000943342 | - J. LIN; A. LU, "Role of pharmacokinetics and Metabolism in Drug Discovery and Development", PHARMACOL. REV., (1997), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 404 - 449, XP000943339 | - C. A. LIPINSKI, "Drug-like properties and the causes of poor solubility and poor permeability", J. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL. METHODS, (2000), vol. 44, doi:doi:10.1016/S1056-8719(00)00107-6, pages 235 - 249, XP001097602 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1056-8719(00)00107-6 | - L. DI; E. KERNS, "Profiling drug-like properties in discovery research", CURR. OPIN. CHEM. BIOL., (2003), vol. 7, pages 402 - 408 | - A.M. MARINO ET AL., "Validation of the 96-well Caco-2 cell culture model for high-throughput permeability and assessment of discovery compounds", INT. J. PHARMACEUTICS, (2005), vol. 297, pages 235 - 241 | - F. WOHNSLAND; B. FALLER, "High-throughput Permeability pH Profile and High-throughput Alkane/Water Log P With Artificial Membranes", J. MED. CHEM., (2001), vol. 44, doi:doi:10.1021/jm001020e, pages 923 - 930, XP002413495 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm001020e | - T. IWATSUBO ET AL., "Prediction of in vivo drug metabolism in the human liver from in vitro metabolism data", PHARM. THER, (1997), vol. 73, pages 147 - 171 | - T. CLAUDEL ET AL., "The Farnesoid X receptor: a molecular link between bile acid and lipid and glucose metabolism", ARTERIOSCLER. THROMB. VASC. BIOL., (2005), vol. 25, no. 10, pages 2020 - 2030 | - S. WESTIN ET AL., "FXR, a therapeutic target for bile acid and lipid disorders", MINI REV. MED. CHEM., (2005), vol. 5, no. 8, pages 719 - 727 | - B. GOODWIN ET AL., "A regulatory cascade of the nuclear receptors FXR, SHP-1, and LRH-1 represses bile acid biosynthesis", MOL. CELL, (2000), vol. 6, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/S1097-2765(00)00051-4, pages 517 - 526, XP002209573 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1097-2765(00)00051-4 | - T. LU ET AL., "Molecular basis for feedback regulation of bile acid synthesis by nuclear receptors", MOL. CELL, (2000), vol. 6, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/S1097-2765(00)00050-2, pages 507 - 515, XP002209572 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1097-2765(00)00050-2 | - C. SINAL ET AL., "Targeted disruption of the nuclear receptor FXR/BAR impairs bile acid and lipid homeostasis", CELL, (2000), vol. 102, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/S0092-8674(00)00062-3, pages 731 - 744, XP055059110 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)00062-3 | - M. ANANTHANARAYANANET, "Human bile salt export pump promoter is transactivated by the farnesoid X receptor/bile acid receptor", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, no. 31, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M011610200, pages 28857 - 28865, XP002430664 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M011610200 | - J. PLASS ET AL., "Farnesoid X receptor and bile salts are involved in transcriptional regulation of the gene encoding the human bile salt export pump", HEPATOLOGY, (2002), vol. 35, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1053/jhep.2002.31724, pages 589 - 96, XP008021676 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/jhep.2002.31724 | - N. URIZAR ET AL., "The farnesoid X-activated receptor mediates bile acid activation of phospholipid transfer protein gene expression", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, no. 50, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M007998200, pages 39313 - 39317, XP002948685 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M007998200 | - H. KAST ET AL., "Regulation of multidrug resistance-associated protein 2 (ABCC2) by the nuclear receptors pregnane X receptor, farnesoid X-activated receptor, and constitutive androstane receptor", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, no. 4, pages 2908 - 2915 | - L. HUANG ET AL., "Farnesoid X receptor activates transcription of the phospholipid pump MDR3", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, no. 51, pages 51085 - 51090 | - M. MIYATA, "Role of farnesoid X receptor in the enhancement of canalicular bile acid output and excretion of unconjugated bile acids: a mechanism for protection against cholic acid-induced liver toxicity", J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER, (2005), vol. 312, no. 2, pages 759 - 766 | - G. RIZZO ET AL., "Role of FXR in regulating bile acid homeostasis and relevance for human diseases", CURR. DRUG TARGETS IMMUNE ENDOCR. METABOL. DISORD, (2005), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 289 - 303 | - P. MALONEY ET AL., "Identification of a chemical tool for the orphan nuclear receptor FXR", J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, no. 16, doi:doi:10.1021/jm0002127, pages 2971 - 2974, XP002421612 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0002127 | - T. WILLSON ET AL., "Chemical genomics: functional analysis of orphan nuclear receptors in the regulation of bile acid metabolism", MED. RES. REV., (2001), vol. 21, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1002/med.1023, pages 513 - 22, XP009013154 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/med.1023 | - R. PELLICCIARI ET AL., "6alpha-ethyl-chenodeoxycholic acid (6-ECDCA), a potent and selective FXR agonist endowed with anticholestatic activity", J. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, no. 17, doi:doi:10.1021/jm025529g, pages 3569 - 3572, XP002370635 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm025529g | - Y. LIU ET AL., "Hepatoprotection by the farnesoid X receptor agonist GW4064 in rat models of intra- and extrahepatic cholestasis", J. CLIN. INVEST, (2003), vol. 112, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1172/JCI200318945, pages 1678 - 1687, XP002992678 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI200318945 | - S. FIORUCCI ET AL., "The nuclear receptor SHP mediates inhibition of hepatic stellate cells by FXR and protects against liver fibrosis", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2004), vol. 127, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1053/j.gastro.2004.08.001, pages 1497 - 1512, XP005313108 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2004.08.001 | - S. FIORUCCI ET AL., "A farnesoid x receptor-small heterodimer partner regulatory cascade modulates tissue metalloproteinase inhibitor-1 and matrix metalloprotease expression in hepatic stellate cells and promotes resolution of liver fibrosis", J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER, (2005), vol. 314, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1124/jpet.105.084905, pages 584 - 595, XP008060974 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/jpet.105.084905 | - S. FIORUCCI ET AL., "Cross-talk between farnesoid-X-receptor (FXR) and peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor gamma contributes to the antifibrotic activity of FXR ligands in rodent models of liver cirrhosis", J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2005), vol. 315, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1124/jpet.105.085597, pages 58 - 68, XP008060972 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/jpet.105.085597 | - A. GALLI ET AL., "Antidiabetic thiazolidinediones inhibit collagen synthesis and hepatic stellate cell activation in vivo and in vitro", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2002), vol. 122, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1053/gast.2002.33666, pages 1924 - 1940, XP055075611 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/gast.2002.33666 | - I. PINEDA TORRA ET AL., "Bile acids induce the expression of the human peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor alpha gene via activation of the farnesoid X receptor", MOL. ENDOCRINOL., (2003), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 259 - 272 | - S. FIORUCCI ET AL., "Protective effects of 6-ethyl chenodeoxycholic acid, a farnesoid X receptor ligand, in estrogen-induced cholestasis", J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2005), vol. 313, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1124/jpet.104.079665, pages 604 - 612, XP008060973 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/jpet.104.079665 | - F. CHEN ET AL., "Progressive familial intrahepatic cholestasis, type 1, is associated with decreased farnesoid X receptor activity", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2004), vol. 126, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1053/j.gastro.2003.12.013, pages 756 - 64, XP005314485 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2003.12.013 | - L. ALVAREZ ET AL., "Reduced hepatic expression of farnesoid X receptor in hereditary cholestasis associated to mutation in ATP8B1", HUM. MOL. GENET, (2004), vol. 13, no. 20, pages 2451 - 60 | - G. RIZZO ET AL., CURR. DRUG TARGETS IMMUNE ENDOCR. METABOL. DISORD, (2005), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 289 - 303 | - G. ZOLLNER, "Role of nuclear receptors in the adaptive response to bile acids and cholestasis: pathogenetic and therapeutic considerations", MOL. PHARM, (2006), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 231 - 51 | - S. CAI ET AL., "FXR: a target for cholestatic syndromes", EXPERT OPIN. THER. TARGETS, (2006), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 409 - 421 | - H. WITTENBURG, "FXR and ABCG5/ABCG8 as determinants of cholesterol gallstone formation from quantitative trait locus mapping in mice", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2003), vol. 125, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/S0016-5085(03)01053-9, pages 868 - 881, XP005313511 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(03)01053-9 | - A. MOSCHETTA ET AL., "Prevention of cholesterol gallstone disease by FXR agonists in a mouse model", NATURE MEDICINE, (2004), vol. 10, no. 12, pages 1352 - 1358 | - S. DOGGRELL, "New targets in and potential treatments for cholesterol gallstone disease", CURR. OPIN. INVESTIG. DRUGS, (2006), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 344 - 348, XP008175325 | - P. MALONEY ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, no. 16, pages 2971 - 2974 | - T. WILLSON ET AL., MED. RES. REV, (2001), vol. 21, no. 6, pages 513 - 22 | - H. KAST ET AL., "Farnesoid X-activated receptor induces apolipoprotein C-II transcription: a molecular mechanism linking plasma triglyceride levels to bile acids", MOL. ENDOCRINOL, (2001), vol. 15, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1210/me.15.10.1720, pages 1720 - 1728, XP001157555 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/me.15.10.1720 | - N.URIZAR ET AL., "A natural product that lowers cholesterol as an antagonist ligand for FXR", SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, no. 5573, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1072891, pages 1703 - 1706, XP002358293 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1072891 | - G. LAMBERT ET AL., "The farnesoid X-receptor is an essential regulator of cholesterol homeostasis", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 2563 - 2570 | - M. WATANABE ET AL., "Bile acids lower triglyceride levels via a pathway involving FXR, SHP, and SREBP-1c", J. CLIN. INVEST, (2004), vol. 113, no. 10, pages 1408 - 1418 | - A. FIGGE ET AL., "Hepatic overexpression of murine Abcbll increases hepatobiliary lipid secretion and reduces hepatic steatosis", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, no. 4, pages 2790 - 2799 | - S. BILZ ET AL., "Activation of the farnesoid X receptor improves lipid metabolism in combined hyperlipidemic hamsters", AM. J. PHYSIOL. ENDOCRINOL. METAB, (2006), vol. 290, no. 4, pages 716 - 22 | - K. STAYROOK ET AL., "Regulation of carbohydrate metabolism by the farnesoid X receptor", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2005), vol. 146, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1210/en.2004-0965, pages 984 - 91, XP008109012 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.2004-0965 | - Y. ZHANG ET AL., "Activation of the nuclear receptor FXR improves hyperglycemia and hyperlipidemia in diabetic mice", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2006), vol. 103, no. 4, pages 1006 - 1011 | - B. CARIOU ET AL., "The farnesoid X receptor modulates adiposity and peripheral insulin sensitivity in mice", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2006), vol. 281, pages 11039 - 11049 | - K. MA ET AL., "Farnesoid X receptor is essential for normal glucose homeostasis", J. CLIN. INVEST., (2006), vol. 116, no. 4, pages 1102 - 1109 | - D. DURAN-SANDOVAL ET AL., "Potential regulatory role of the farnesoid X receptor in the metabolic syndrome", BIOCHIMIE, (2005), vol. 87, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biochi.2004.11.018, pages 93 - 98, XP004768698 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biochi.2004.11.018 | - J. HOLT ET AL., GENES DEV., (2003), vol. 17, no. 13, pages 1581 - 1591 | - E. TOMLINSON ET AL., "Transgenic mice expressing human fibroblast growth factor-19 display increased metabolic rate and decreased adiposity", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2002), vol. 143, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1210/en.143.5.1741, pages 1741 - 1747, XP002972819 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.143.5.1741 | - E. HANNIMAN ET AL., "Loss of functional farnesoid X receptor increases atherosclerotic lesions in apolipoprotein E-deficient mice", J. LIPID RES, (2005), vol. 46, no. 12, pages 2595 - 2604 | - F. HE ET AL., "Down regulation of endothelin-1 by farnesoid X receptor in vascular endothelial cells", CIRC. RES, (2006), vol. 98, no. 2, pages 192 - 9 | - E. NIESOR ET AL., "The nuclear receptors FXR and LXRalpha: potential targets for the development of drugs affecting lipid metabolism and neoplastic diseases", CURR. PHARM. DES, (2001), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:doi:10.2174/1381612013398185, pages 231 - 59, XP008004861 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1381612013398185 | - D. BISHOP-BAILEY ET AL., "Expression and activation of the farnesoid X receptor in the vasculature", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (2004), vol. 101, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0400046101, pages 3668 - 3673, XP002358294 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0400046101 | - J. SILVA, "Lipids isolated from bone induce the migration of human breast cancer cells", J. LIPID RES, (2006), vol. 47, no. 4, pages 724 - 733 | - G. DE GOTTARDI ET AL., "The bile acid nuclear receptor FXR and the bile acid binding protein IBABP are differently expressed in colon cancer", DIG. DIS. SCI., (2004), vol. 49, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1023/B:DDAS.0000034558.78747.98, pages 982 - 989, XP019237067 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:DDAS.0000034558.78747.98 | - D. DURAN-SANDOVAL ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, no. 33, pages 29971 - 29979 | - Y. ZHANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (2006), vol. 103, no. 4, pages 1006 - 1011 | - T. INAGAKI ET AL., "Regulation of antibacterial defense in the small intestine by the nuclear bile acid receptor", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U S A., (2006), vol. 103, no. 10, pages 3920 - 3905 | - "March's Advanced Organic Chemistry: Reactions, Mechanisms, and Structure", JOHN WILEY & SONS | - MALONEY ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, no. 16, pages 2971 - 2974 | - DOLEY ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., (1963), pages 5838 - 5845 | - HIMBERT ET AL., LIEBIGS ANN. CHEM, (1990), vol. 4, pages 403 - 407 | - BEYER ET AL., JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANN CHEM, (1970), pages 45 - 54 | - J. PIET ET AL., BULL. SOC. CHIM. BELG, (1996), vol. 105, no. 1, pages 33 - 44 | - A. CWIKLICKI ET AL., ARCH. PHARM, (2004), vol. 337, no. 3, pages 156 - 163 | - March's Advanced Organic Chemistry: Reactions, Mechanisms, and Structure, JOHN WILEY & SONS | - "Database", Database accession no. 005123 | - GROBER ET AL., JBC, (1999), vol. 174, pages 29749 - 29754 | - DYER ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (2000), no. 282, pages 158 - 161 |