EP2017916 - Shutdown of a fuel cell supplied with pure oxygen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2009/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paganelli, Gino Route de Cutterwil, 4 1782 Belfaux / CH | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Bauvir, Jacques Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Bauvir, Jacques Michelin & Cie Service SGD/LG/PI C.E.R. Ladoux - F35 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08009763.7 | 29.05.2008 | [2009/04] | Priority number, date | FR20070004258 | 15.06.2007 Original published format: FR 0704258 | [2009/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2017916 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2017916 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2017916 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
H01M8/04395 (EP,US);
H01M8/10 (KR);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04164 (EP,US);
H01M8/04223 (US);
H01M8/04228 (EP);
H01M8/04253 (EP,US);
H01M8/04291 (EP,US);
H01M8/04302 (US);
H01M8/04303 (EP);
H01M8/0491 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
H01M2250/20 (EP,US);
H01M8/04179 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02T90/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] | Title | German: | Abschalten einer mit reinem Sauerstoff gespeisten Brennstoffzelle | [2009/04] | English: | Shutdown of a fuel cell supplied with pure oxygen | [2009/04] | French: | Arrêt d'une plie à combustible alimentée en oxygène pur | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 08.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2010 | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | DK | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | HR | 06.10.2010 | HU | 06.10.2010 | IE | 06.10.2010 | IT | 06.10.2010 | LT | 06.10.2010 | LV | 06.10.2010 | MT | 06.10.2010 | NL | 06.10.2010 | PL | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SE | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | TR | 06.10.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | NO | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | ES | 17.01.2011 | IS | 06.02.2011 | PT | 07.02.2011 | LU | 29.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
TR | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
LU | 29.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
LU | 29.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
LU | 29.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005078845 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 5, line 15 - page 17, line 21 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO2005088756 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [DA]FR2873498 (CONCEPTION & DEV MICHELIN SA [CH], et al) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006064893 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 5, line 19 - page 14, line 18 * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US4226919 | US6068942 | US2001055707 | DE10059393 | WO2005078845 | WO2005088756 | WO2006012954 | WO2006064893 |