11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
07.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
02.06.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] |
14.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
31.03.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
24.06.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
17.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
08.06.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.02.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.01.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.12.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
11.12.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] |
11.12.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] |
19.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2014 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
10.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2011 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
01.04.2011 |
First examination report |
|
25.03.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.02.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.02.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
23.07.2010 |
Publication of search report |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
23.07.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
23.07.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
08.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.11.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |