EP2001122 - Electric motor control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC CORPORATION 3580 Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2011/08] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Fanuc Ltd 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwashita, Yasusuke c/o Fanuc LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | 02 /
Akiyama, Takahiro c/o Fanuc LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | 03 /
Niwa, Masakazu c/o Fanuc LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | 04 /
Tsutsumi, Tomohisa c/o Fanuc LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2017/22] |
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
Iwashita, Yasusuke Fanuc LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | ||
02 /
Akiyama, Takahiro Fanuc LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | |||
03 /
Niwa, Masakazu Fanuc LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | |||
04 /
Tsutsumi, Tomohisa Fanuc LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/50] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08010125.6 | 03.06.2008 | [2008/50] | Priority number, date | JP20070149636 | 05.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007149636 | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2001122 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2001122 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2001122 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02P21/00, H02P21/08, H02P21/22, // G05B19/19 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
H02P21/0003 (EP,US);
H02P21/08 (EP,US);
H02P21/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/32] | H02P21/00, H02P21/08, // G05B19/19 | ||
Former IPC [2008/50] | H02P21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE [2016/15] |
Former [2008/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektromotorsteuerung | [2008/50] | English: | Electric motor control device | [2008/50] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de moteur électrique | [2008/50] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 06.02.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0310050 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [A] 2 [I] 3-5; | [XI]US4962339 (SCHAUDER COLIN D [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document * [I] 3,4; | [A]US5196778 (HAYASHIDA TAKAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US6275000 (NISHIMURA SHINJI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 23 - line 30 * * column 3, line 18 - line 67; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US6335609 (AMEY DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0667253B |