EP2009104 - Phosphorylation epitopes of Tau protein for the diagnosis and treatment of Alzheimer's disease [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mandelkow, Eva-Maria Baron-Voght-Strasse 212a 22607 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Mandelkow, Eckhard Baron-Voght-Strasse 212a 22607 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Drewes, Gerhard, Dr. Burgstrasse 13 69121 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
Biernat, Jacek Blockhorner Weiden 8 22869 Schenefeld / DE | 05 /
Lichtenberg-Kraag, Birgit, Dr. Grizzlybärweg 2a 16727 Oberkrämer / DE | 06 /
Steiner, Barbara, Dr. Altleininger Strasse 8 67316 Carlsberg / DE | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08010527.3 | 07.12.1992 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | EP19910120974 | 06.12.1991 Original published format: EP 91120974 | EP19920119551 | 16.11.1992 Original published format: EP 92119551 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2009104 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, G01N33/68, A61K38/45 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07K14/4711 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C12N9/12 (EP,US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
G01N2333/4709 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2821 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2009/01] | Title | German: | Phosphorylierungsepitope des Tau-Proteins zur Diagnose und Behandlung von Morbus Alzheimer | [2009/01] | English: | Phosphorylation epitopes of Tau protein for the diagnosis and treatment of Alzheimer's disease | [2009/01] | French: | Épitopes de phosphorylation de protéine tau pour le diagnostic et le traitement de la maladie d'Alzheimer | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/48] | 12.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93901671.3 / EP0618968 | EP98121175.8 / EP0911398 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19930901671) is 23.05.1997 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0303555 (KOEHLER CHEMIE DR FRANZ [DE]); | [A]WO8903993 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB]); | [X]US4874694 (GANDY SAMUEL E [US], et al); | [X]EP0457295 (UNIV ROCKEFELLER [US]); | [E]WO9303148 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]); | [T]WO9613592 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE], et al); |